|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/05/1925 | 30/07/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6510 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1928 | 18/10/1928 | 62 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1931 | 15/10/1931 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1934 | 03/03/1934 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1066 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1936 | 07/08/1936 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/08/1938 | 14/10/1938 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1940 | 04/01/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/03/1943 | 12/06/1943 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 3408 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1945 | 12/01/1946 | 81 days | General | Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/06/1948 | 28/07/1948 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63791 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1950 | 02/12/1950 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 22137 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1953 | 11/07/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 22101 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1956 | 06/10/1956 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1961 | 13/04/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1894 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21871 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
28/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1925. Dep: 30/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6510 |
||
30/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/07/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
15/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
18/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 18/10/1928. | ||
29/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 15/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/01/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1934. Dep: 03/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1066 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 07/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1938. Dep: 14/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1046 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 04/01/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1943. Dep: 12/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3408 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
24/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1945. Dep: 12/01/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3208 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3791 | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
06/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1948. Dep: 28/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3300 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63791 |
||
05/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1950. Dep: 02/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22137 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22101 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1956. Dep: 06/10/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28372 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1961. Dep: 13/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
05/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63791 from Frodingham (36C) |