Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1895 m/e 02/1918
Great Central Railway 1283c   19/01/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6283   24/05/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3792   02/06/1946
British Railways 63792 5w/e 26/02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O1 (2-8-0)16/09/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21872
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 19/01/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1918
GOR   Gorton on 31/01/1924
MAR   March on 04/10/1944
ANN   Annesley on 13/02/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1173)
24/05/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1495)
22/12/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1544)
29/11/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1056)
27/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1757)
18/08/1934 Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
18/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1272)
08/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1121)
18/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1002)
14/12/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3246)
27/06/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1024)
16/09/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5022)
16/11/1946 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9432)
05/02/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9427)
30/06/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28328)
01/08/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28310)
30/06/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28393)
31/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28257)
06/01/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28856)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 12/01/1924 19/01/1924 8 days Light Repair Renumbered to GCR 1283c
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1924 24/05/1924 50 days General Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6283
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1926 03/04/1926 57 days General    
Gorton Works 15/09/1928 22/12/1928 99 days General Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1930 29/11/1930 15 days General Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1932 27/08/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1934 18/08/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 08/08/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1938 18/06/1938 22 days General Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1940 14/12/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/05/1942 27/06/1942 32 days General Damaged by enemy action at York
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1944 16/09/1944 57 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1946 16/11/1946 95 days General Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1948 05/02/1949 48 days General Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63792
 
Gorton Works 06/06/1951 30/06/1951 25 days General Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/07/1951 10/07/1951 8 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 07/08/1952 30/08/1952 24 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 25/06/1953 01/08/1953 38 days General Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1955 30/06/1955 60 days General Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/08/1957 31/08/1957 30 days General Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1959 06/05/1959 28 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 22/11/1960 06/01/1961 46 days General Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1895
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21872
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/01/1924. Dep: 19/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to GCR 1283c
   
19/01/1924 To Stock To GCR stock    
31/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 24/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1495 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6283
   
06/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1926. Dep: 03/04/1926.    
15/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1544 (Diagram 15)
   
15/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1930. Dep: 29/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1056 (Diagram 15)
   
20/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1757 (Diagram 15)
   
04/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 18/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1272 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
   
25/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1121 (Diagram 15)
   
28/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1002 (Diagram 15)
   
07/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3246 (Diagram 15)
   
27/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Damaged by enemy action at York
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
   
22/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5022 (Diagram 100A)
   
04/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
02/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3792    
14/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9432 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1948. Dep: 05/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63792
   
13/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
06/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1951. Dep: 30/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28328 (Diagram 100A)
   
03/07/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 10/07/1951.    
07/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/08/1952. Dep: 30/08/1952.    
25/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1953. Dep: 01/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28310 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 30/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28393 (Diagram 100A)
   
02/08/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28257 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/04/1959. Dep: 06/05/1959.    
22/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1960. Dep: 06/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A)
   
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63792 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev