Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1896 m/e 02/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6280   22/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3793   29/09/1946
British Railways 63793 w/e 23/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)12/04/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21873
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 22/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 09/05/1965 off Frodingham (36C)
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 6/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1918
GOR   Gorton on 22/03/1924
DON   Doncaster on 23/12/1924
FRO   Frodingham on 25/07/1943
     Withdrawn on 09/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 09/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1330)
28/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 588)
23/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1379)
17/03/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1470)
12/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 867)
13/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1281)
03/05/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3252)
07/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3390)
05/01/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3413)
15/01/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1041)
16/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22104)
06/09/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22291)
31/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22885)
12/04/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28948)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 22/03/1924 8 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6280
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1924 16/12/1924 160 days General    
Gorton Works 24/06/1927 04/08/1927 42 days General    
Gorton Works 02/09/1929 28/11/1929 88 days General Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1931 23/10/1931 28 days General Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1934 17/03/1934 34 days General Altered spring gear for working To Whitemoor
Boiler number C1470 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/09/1935 12/10/1935 32 days General Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1937 13/11/1937 21 days General Altered chimney
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1939 28/10/1939 39 days General    
Gorton Works 12/03/1941 03/05/1941 53 days General Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1942 07/11/1942 55 days General Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1946 05/01/1946 -296 days General    
Gorton Works 07/12/1947 15/01/1948 40 days General Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1950 16/09/1950 38 days General Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63793
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1950 22/09/1950 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 09/08/1952 06/09/1952 29 days General Boiler number 22291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1955 31/03/1955 32 days General Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/02/1958 12/04/1958 51 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28948 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1961 18/04/1961 39 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 11/04/1962 19/04/1962 9 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1896
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21873
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6280
   
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/07/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1924. Dep: 16/12/1924.    
23/12/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
24/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1927. Dep: 04/08/1927.    
02/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1929. Dep: 28/11/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 588 (Diagram 15)
   
26/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 23/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1379 (Diagram 15)
   
12/02/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934.
Work undertaken:
Altered spring gear for working To Whitemoor
Boiler number C1470 (Diagram 15)
   
11/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
   
24/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1937. Dep: 13/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Altered chimney
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1939. Dep: 28/10/1939.    
12/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
   
14/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3390 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
05/01/1946 Modification Diagram 15 number 3413 boiler fitted    
29/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3793    
29/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1946. Dep: 05/01/1946.    
07/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 15/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
   
10/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22104 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63793
   
20/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/09/1950. Dep: 22/09/1950.    
09/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1952. Dep: 06/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22291 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 31/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15)
   
21/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1958. Dep: 12/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28948 (Diagram 100A)
   
11/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1961. Dep: 18/04/1961.    
11/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/04/1962. Dep: 19/04/1962.    
09/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63793 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev