|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 22/03/1924 | 05/04/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6277 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1924 | 29/11/1924 | 134 days | General | Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1927 | 20/08/1927 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/11/1931 | 21/11/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1933 | 06/01/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 09/05/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1938 | 09/04/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/07/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/03/1943 | 03/04/1943 | 19 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1944 | 11/11/1944 | 11 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1948 | 16/10/1948 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 63794 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/03/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1954 | 09/10/1954 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/10/1955 | 26/10/1955 | 5 days | Weighing | |||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1957 | 18/05/1957 | 29 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28932 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 11/06/1960 | 09/07/1960 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1961 | 18/11/1961 | 15 days | Light Casual |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1898 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21875 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
22/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6277 |
||
05/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
05/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
19/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1153 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
16/07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 20/08/1927. | ||
26/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1204 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1358 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
06/05/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
26/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3323 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/07/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1200 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/11/1940 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
07/02/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1943. Dep: 03/04/1943. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3675 (Diagram 15D) |
||
03/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
01/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1944. Dep: 11/11/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
04/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5103 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3794 | ||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3689 (Diagram 15D) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
02/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/10/1948. Dep: 16/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63794 |
||
08/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3688 (Diagram 15D) |
||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
22/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. | ||
04/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1954. Dep: 09/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22317 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Weighing) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 26/10/1955. | ||
20/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1957. Dep: 18/05/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28932 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. | ||
11/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/06/1960. Dep: 09/07/1960. | ||
04/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1961. Dep: 18/11/1961. | ||
03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63794 from Gorton (9G) |