Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 937 Today
» 919 Yesterday
» 3766 Week
» 4705 Month
» 208195 Year
» 1873571 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1899 m/e 02/1918
London and North Western Railway 2941 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6595   17/09/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3795   07/04/1946
British Railways 63795 w/e 18/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/302/1918
O1 (2-8-0)12/02/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21876
To Service During 02/1918
Taken into Stock 20/09/1927
Withdrawal Wed 30/10/1963 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 7/2/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   12/1919
ROD       08/1921
LNG   Langwith Junction on 20/09/1927
DON   Doncaster on 20/02/1930
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
WFD   Woodford Halse on 04/02/1943
GOR   Gorton on 10/03/1943
WHL   West Hartlepool on 20/03/1943
GOR   Gorton on 13/03/1944
38B   Annesley on 02/04/1950
31B   March on 17/02/1957
41H   Staveley (G.C.) on 13/12/1959
     Withdrawn on 30/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 30/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1177)
28/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1861)
22/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1463)
30/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1303)
12/03/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1284)
03/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3218)
12/02/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9427)
18/12/1948 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 9430)
06/10/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28351)
10/10/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28283)
18/12/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28806)
04/02/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28839)
11/01/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28298)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 11/06/1927 17/09/1927 99 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6595
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 22/02/1930 36 days General    
Gorton Works 14/11/1931 28/11/1931 15 days General Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1933 22/07/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/11/1935 30/11/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1938 12/03/1938 15 days General Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/07/1940 03/08/1940 15 days General Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1941 10/05/1941 22 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 28/10/1943 12/02/1944 108 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1946 27/07/1946 57 days General    
Gorton Works 04/12/1948 18/12/1948 15 days General Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63795
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1950 18/02/1950 15 days Light Casual After collision
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1951 17/03/1951 1 day Light Casual    
Gorton Works 08/09/1951 06/10/1951 29 days General Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1953 10/10/1953 22 days General Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1954 18/12/1954 29 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1955 04/02/1956 36 days General Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1957 11/01/1958 36 days General Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1958 25/10/1958 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 29/07/1961 09/09/1961 43 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 16/09/1961 23/09/1961 8 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1899
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21876
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2941    
08/1921 Allocation      
11/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6595
   
20/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
20/09/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.    
20/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/11/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1931. Dep: 28/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1861 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1933. Dep: 22/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1463 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1303 (Diagram 15)
   
26/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 12/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1284 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1940. Dep: 03/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3218 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
19/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941.    
04/02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
10/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
28/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1943. Dep: 12/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 9427 (Diagram 100A)
   
13/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3795    
01/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 27/07/1946.    
04/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1948. Dep: 18/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9430 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63795
   
04/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1950. Dep: 18/02/1950.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
02/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
17/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1951. Dep: 17/03/1951.    
08/09/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28351 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28283 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/11/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28806 (Diagram 100A)
   
31/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1955. Dep: 04/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28839 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1957. Dep: 11/01/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28298 (Diagram 100A)
   
18/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/10/1958. Dep: 25/10/1958.    
13/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
29/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/07/1961. Dep: 09/09/1961.    
16/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961.    
30/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63795 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev