Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 48 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1885 Week
» 13030 Month
» 112815 Year
» 1778191 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1904 m/e 03/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6275   01/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3798   28/07/1946
British Railways 63798 w/e 13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21881
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 01/03/1924
Withdrawal Thu 24/05/1962 off Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 25 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1918
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 01/03/1924
LNG   Langwith Junction on 05/10/1939
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 02/12/1939
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
WFD   Woodford Halse on 28/01/1943
CLK   Colwick on 21/03/1943
DON   Doncaster on 23/01/1944
LNG   Langwith Junction on 12/03/1944
CLK   Colwick on 27/10/1946
ANN   Annesley on 06/06/1948
ANN   Annesley w/e 12/06/1948
38A   Colwick on 28/09/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 04/10/1952
36B   Mexborough on 29/01/1956
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 06/08/1961
     Withdrawn on 24/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 4w/e 02/09/1961
WDN   on 24/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1295)
04/10/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1140)
31/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1147)
20/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 867)
17/08/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1024)
28/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3307)
20/03/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 487)
19/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3236)
10/05/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3312)
13/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3285)
24/11/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22230)
06/02/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22155)
27/04/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22212)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 01/03/1924 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6275
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1924 04/10/1924 99 days General Boiler number 1140 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 07/05/1927 43 days General    
Gorton Works 23/03/1929 20/04/1929 29 days General    
Gorton Works 10/01/1931 31/01/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1933 20/05/1933 8 days General Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1935 17/08/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1937 28/08/1937 15 days General Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1939 02/12/1939 15 days General    
Gorton Works 02/03/1943 20/03/1943 19 days General Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1945 19/05/1945 36 days General Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1947 10/05/1947 36 days General Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1949 13/08/1949 22 days General Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63798
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1951 24/11/1951 15 days General Boiler number 22230 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1951 09/12/1951 13 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 03/01/1953 07/02/1953 36 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 10/02/1953 15/02/1953 6 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 16/01/1954 06/02/1954 22 days General Boiler number 22155 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1954 09/02/1954 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 30/03/1957 27/04/1957 29 days General Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1957 04/05/1957 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 16/01/1960 05/03/1960 50 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 23/05/1962 23/05/1962 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1904
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21881
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6275
   
01/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
01/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
28/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 04/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1140 (Diagram 15)
   
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 07/05/1927.    
23/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929.    
10/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1931. Dep: 31/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1147 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1024 (Diagram 15)
   
14/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3307 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
18/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939.    
02/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
28/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1943. Dep: 20/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 487 (Diagram 15)
   
21/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/03/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
14/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1945. Dep: 19/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3798    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 10/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15)
   
06/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
12/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
23/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3285 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63798
   
10/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22230 (Diagram 15)
   
27/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/11/1951. Dep: 09/12/1951.    
28/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
03/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953.    
10/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1953. Dep: 15/02/1953.    
16/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22155 (Diagram 15)
   
08/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/02/1954. Dep: 09/02/1954.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
30/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22212 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/05/1957. Dep: 04/05/1957.    
16/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1960. Dep: 05/03/1960.    
06/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
23/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 23/05/1962.    
24/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63798 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    

prev prev