Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 892 Today
» 919 Yesterday
» 3721 Week
» 4660 Month
» 208150 Year
» 1873526 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1907 m/e 03/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6511   06/06/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3800   01/06/1946
British Railways 63800 w/e 12/06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)22/06/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21884
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 06/06/1925
Withdrawal Sat 16/05/1964 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Cox & Danks, Wadsley Bridge, 6/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1918
GOR   Gorton on 02/06/1925
DON   Doncaster on 11/07/1925
LNG   Langwith Junction on 14/05/1943
DON   Doncaster on 27/10/1946
40E   Langwith Junction on 25/06/1950
40E   Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
     Withdrawn on 16/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction m/e 30/06/1950
WDN   on 16/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1774)
09/08/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1363)
10/09/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1947)
06/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1072)
30/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1413)
19/10/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1880)
04/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1443)
25/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1276)
31/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3309)
22/04/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3395)
01/06/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1065)
11/06/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3343)
14/10/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22117)
27/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22888)
11/12/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22272)
22/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28934)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 04/04/1925 06/06/1925 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6511
 
Gorton Works 02/07/1927 09/08/1927 39 days General Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/07/1929 10/09/1929 63 days General Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1931 06/08/1931 60 days General Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1933 30/12/1933 37 days General Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1935 19/10/1935 47 days General Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1937 04/11/1937 31 days General Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1939 25/11/1939 52 days General Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1942 31/01/1942 29 days General Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1944 22/04/1944 27 days General Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1946 01/06/1946 53 days General Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3800
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1948 11/06/1948 40 days General Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63800
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1950 14/10/1950 28 days General Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1952 27/12/1952 26 days General Boiler number 22888 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/11/1954 11/12/1954 39 days General Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1957 22/06/1957 51 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28934 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/08/1958 10/09/1958 22 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 17/06/1960 30/07/1960 44 days Heavy Intermediate    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1907
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21884
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
04/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1925. Dep: 06/06/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6511
   
02/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
06/06/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
11/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1927. Dep: 09/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15)
   
10/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1929. Dep: 10/09/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1947 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1931. Dep: 06/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1072 (Diagram 15)
   
24/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1933. Dep: 30/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1413 (Diagram 15)
   
03/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1935. Dep: 19/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1880 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1937. Dep: 04/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1443 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1276 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1942. Dep: 31/01/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1944. Dep: 22/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3800
   
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
03/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3343 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63800
   
25/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
17/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1950. Dep: 14/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22117 (Diagram 15)
   
02/12/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1952. Dep: 27/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22888 (Diagram 15)
   
03/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22272 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28934 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 10/09/1958.    
17/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/06/1960. Dep: 30/07/1960.    
16/05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63800 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev