Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 160 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3673 Week
» 23966 Month
» 201870 Year
» 1867246 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1908 m/e 03/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6598   30/09/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3801   01/09/1946
British Railways 63801 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)18/08/1956
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21885
To Service During 03/1918
Taken into Stock 30/09/1927
Withdrawal Tue 16/07/1963 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 45 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Notes
Notes Into Doncaster for cutting up 22/8/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1918
CLK   Colwick on 30/09/1927
LNG   Langwith Junction on 31/10/1927
CLK   Colwick on 27/10/1946
ANN   Annesley on 12/10/1947
CLK   Colwick on 08/02/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 14/02/1948
ANN   Annesley on 14/11/1948
ANN   Annesley w/e 20/11/1948
CLK   Colwick on 11/09/1949
CLK   Colwick w/e 17/09/1949
38B   Annesley on 02/09/1951
38B   Annesley w/e 08/09/1951
38A   Colwick on 04/11/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 10/11/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) on 20/07/1952
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 09/08/1952
38A   Colwick on 22/09/1952
38A   Colwick 4w/e 04/10/1952
38D   Staveley (G.C.) on 05/10/1952
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 01/11/1952
41J   Langwith Junction on 29/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 16/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 20/11/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 17/09/1949
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 09/08/1952
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 41J Langwith Junction 4w/e 26/12/1959
WDN   on 16/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1208)
15/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1247)
04/08/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1231)
03/10/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
03/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1270)
24/09/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1350)
23/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3344)
05/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3266)
18/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3251)
09/10/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3352)
07/04/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22173)
08/03/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22252)
17/10/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22122)
18/08/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28898)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 30/09/1927 49 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6598
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1930 04/04/1930 54 days General    
Gorton Works 27/05/1932 15/07/1932 50 days General Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1934 04/08/1934 25 days General Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/12/1934 16/02/1935 50 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 01/09/1936 03/10/1936 33 days General Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1938 24/09/1938 63 days General Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1940 23/11/1940 31 days General Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1942 05/09/1942 39 days General Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1944 18/11/1944 31 days General Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1946 08/01/1947 95 days General    
Gorton Works 30/08/1948 09/10/1948 41 days General Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63801
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1951 07/04/1951 45 days General Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/04/1951 13/04/1951 4 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 30/01/1952 08/03/1952 39 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 22252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1953 17/10/1953 22 days General Boiler number 22122 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1953 28/10/1953 9 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 11/03/1954 25/03/1954 15 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 10/05/1956 18/08/1956 101 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28898 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1960 25/03/1960 31 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 30/03/1960 05/04/1960 7 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1908
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21885
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 30/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6598
   
30/09/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/09/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
31/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1930. Dep: 04/04/1930.    
27/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1932. Dep: 15/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1247 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15)
   
29/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1934. Dep: 16/02/1935.    
01/09/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1270 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
24/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/07/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1350 (Diagram 15)
   
24/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1940. Dep: 23/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
   
19/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3251 (Diagram 15)
   
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3801    
06/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1946. Dep: 08/01/1947.    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
14/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3352 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63801
   
14/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
20/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
11/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
17/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
22/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1951. Dep: 07/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22173 (Diagram 15)
   
10/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/04/1951. Dep: 13/04/1951.    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
04/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1952. Dep: 08/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22252 (Diagram 15)
   
20/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
05/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
26/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22122 (Diagram 15)
   
20/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1953. Dep: 28/10/1953.    
11/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1954. Dep: 25/03/1954.    
10/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1956. Dep: 18/08/1956.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28898 (Diagram 100A)
   
29/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
24/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/02/1960. Dep: 25/03/1960.    
30/03/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1960. Dep: 05/04/1960.    
16/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63801 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev