Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 303 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 5914 Week
» 16960 Month
» 16960 Year
» 1682336 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1910 m/e 04/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6281   16/02/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3802   06/10/1946
British Railways 63802 w/e 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/304/1918
O4/8 (2-8-0)29/04/1944
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21887
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 16/02/1924
Withdrawal Tue 23/06/1964 off Frodingham (36C)
Scrapping T W Ward (Beighton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to T W Ward, Beighton, 8/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1918
GOR Gorton on 07/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 13/03/1924
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 30/01/1934
GOR Gorton on 21/05/1944
FRO Frodingham on 07/01/1945
IMM Immingham on 18/12/1949
36D Barnsley on 02/02/1958
41F Mexborough on 03/01/1960
36C Frodingham on 05/11/1961
36A Doncaster on 12/11/1961
36C Frodingham on 14/10/1962
   Withdrawn on 23/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 24/12/1949
ALLOC 36D Barnsley 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 5w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 25/10/1962
WDN   on 23/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
24/07/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1445)
20/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1473)
29/08/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1501)
13/01/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1385)
06/12/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1011)
18/12/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 867)
13/07/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3405)
27/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3328)
29/04/1944 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5011)
04/01/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5015)
05/05/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5007)
20/10/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28355)
09/01/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28813)
13/10/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28343)
16/11/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28941)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 16/02/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6281
 
Gorton Works 19/05/1924 24/07/1924 67 days General
Boiler number 1445 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1926 04/02/1927 61 days General  
Gorton Works 25/02/1929 20/06/1929 116 days General
Boiler number 1473 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1931 29/08/1931 32 days General
Boiler number 1501 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1933 13/01/1934 47 days General
Boiler number 1385 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/11/1935 06/12/1935 30 days General
Boiler number 1011 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 18/12/1937 22 days General
Altered chimney
Boiler number 867 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1940 13/07/1940 19 days General
Boiler number 3405 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 14/09/1942 27/11/1942 75 days General
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1944 29/04/1944 90 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 5011 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1945 28/04/1945 24 days General  
Gorton Works 19/11/1946 04/01/1947 47 days General
Boiler number 5015 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1949 05/05/1949 33 days General
Boiler number 5007 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63802
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1951 20/10/1951 38 days General
Boiler number 28355 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/10/1951 02/11/1951 11 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 15/12/1953 09/01/1954 26 days General
Boiler number 28813 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1956 13/10/1956 36 days General
Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1958 04/10/1958 12 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 13/10/1960 16/11/1960 35 days General
Boiler number 28941 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1910
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21887
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
07/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
13/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
30/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
21/05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
06/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3802    
18/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
05/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
12/11/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
23/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 63802 from Frodingham (36C)    

prev prev