Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 461 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7144 Week
» 18190 Month
» 18190 Year
» 1683566 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1911 m/e 04/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6599   30/07/1927
War Dept. 734   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21888
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 26/07/1927
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 734 and sent to the Middle East via Greenock, 9/10/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1918
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 26/07/1927
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 19/01/1934
ANN Annesley on 22/02/1937
   Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1125)
21/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 809)
08/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1937)
19/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
14/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3299)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3372)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 30/07/1927 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6599
 
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 09/11/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 07/05/1932 21/05/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 809 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/05/1935 08/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/06/1937 19/06/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/09/1939 14/10/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/09/1941 20/09/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 734
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1911
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21888
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
26/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
26/07/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
19/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
22/02/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 734 from Annesley (ANN)    

prev prev