Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 193 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3582 Week
» 22483 Month
» 22483 Year
» 1687859 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1913 m/e 04/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6512   03/10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3804   01/10/1946
British Railways 63804 w/e 05/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21890
To Service During 04/1918
Taken into Stock 03/10/1925
Withdrawal Fri 11/12/1959 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1918
GOR Gorton on 01/10/1925
IMM Immingham on 07/10/1925
GRA Grantham on 07/05/1941
DON Doncaster on 21/11/1942
LNG Langwith Junction on 14/05/1943
CLK Colwick on 20/09/1944
ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
38A Colwick on 05/02/1950
38D Staveley (G.C.) on 14/11/1954
   Withdrawn on 11/12/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 12/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 11/02/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 04/12/1954
WDN   on 11/12/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1036)
21/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1310)
17/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1045)
06/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1353)
23/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3309)
03/01/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1065)
15/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3292)
08/02/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
05/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3238)
09/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22139)
07/06/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22274)
29/08/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22174)
10/11/1956 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22285)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 20/06/1925 03/10/1925 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6512
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1928 25/02/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 24/05/1930 21/06/1930 29 days General
Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/12/1932 17/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1045 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 06/07/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1937 23/10/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1939 02/12/1939 15 days General  
Gorton Works 18/12/1941 03/01/1942 17 days General
Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1943 15/01/1944 23 days General
Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1947 08/02/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/02/1949 05/03/1949 22 days General
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63804
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1950 27/05/1950 15 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 25/11/1950 09/12/1950 15 days General
Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1950 14/12/1950 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/05/1952 07/06/1952 15 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 22274 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1953 29/08/1953 22 days General
Boiler number 22174 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/09/1953 06/09/1953 6 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/07/1954 11/09/1954 48 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 14/09/1954 16/09/1954 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 13/10/1956 10/11/1956 29 days General
Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1956 15/11/1956 3 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 26/11/1959 26/11/1959 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1913
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21890
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
01/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
07/05/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
14/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
20/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3804    
12/10/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
14/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
11/12/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63804 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev