|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/06/1925 | 03/10/1925 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6512 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1928 | 25/02/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1930 | 21/06/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1932 | 17/12/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1045 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/10/1937 | 23/10/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1939 | 02/12/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/12/1941 | 03/01/1942 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1949 | 05/03/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63804 |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1950 | 14/12/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1952 | 07/06/1952 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22274 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/08/1953 | 29/08/1953 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22174 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1953 | 06/09/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1954 | 11/09/1954 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1954 | 16/09/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1956 | 10/11/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/11/1956 | 15/11/1956 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1959 | 26/11/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1913 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21890 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
20/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1925. Dep: 03/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6512 |
||
01/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/10/1925 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
07/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
14/01/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 25/02/1928. | ||
24/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1930. Dep: 21/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1310 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 17/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1045 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1353 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 23/10/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3309 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939. | ||
07/05/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (GRA) | ||
18/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1941. Dep: 03/01/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1065 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
14/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
24/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3292 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3804 | ||
11/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1949. Dep: 05/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63804 |
||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
13/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. | ||
25/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22139 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1950. Dep: 14/12/1950. | ||
24/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 24/05/1952. Dep: 07/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22274 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1953. Dep: 29/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22174 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1953. Dep: 06/09/1953. | ||
26/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954. | ||
14/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/09/1954. Dep: 16/09/1954. | ||
14/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
13/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22285 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 15/11/1956. | ||
26/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 26/11/1959. Dep: 26/11/1959. | ||
11/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63804 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |