Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 64 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 4536 Week
» 23437 Month
» 23437 Year
» 1688813 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1914 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6600   04/05/1929
War Dept. 718   14/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21891
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 30/04/1929
Withdrawal Sun 14/09/1941 off Colwick (CLK)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 15 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 718 and sent to the Middle East via Birkenhead, 17/9/41

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
CLK Colwick on 30/04/1929
   Withdrawn on 14/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1219)
07/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1489)
09/12/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 825)
07/03/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
07/03/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1126)
20/03/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1228)
10/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3372)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3434)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1929 04/05/1929 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6600
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1931 07/11/1931 15 days General
Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 09/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1936 07/03/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 13/03/1937 20/03/1937 8 days Heavy
Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/05/1939 10/06/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1941 13/09/1941 19 days General
Boiler number 3434 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1914
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21891
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/04/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
30/04/1929 To Stock To ROD stock    
14/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 718 from Colwick (CLK)    
14/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 718    

prev prev