|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1929 | 04/05/1929 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6600 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/10/1931 | 07/11/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1936 | 07/03/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1937 | 20/03/1937 | 8 days | Heavy | Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1939 | 10/06/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1941 | 13/09/1941 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3434 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1914 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21891 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 04/05/1929. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6600 |
||
30/04/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/04/1929 | To Stock | To ROD stock | ||
24/10/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1489 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1126 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
13/03/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/03/1937. Dep: 20/03/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1228 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1939. Dep: 10/06/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3372 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3434 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 718 from Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 718 |