Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 41 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1878 Week
» 13023 Month
» 112808 Year
» 1778184 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1917 m/e 05/1918
London and North Western Railway 2892 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6519   20/02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3808   30/07/1946
British Railways 63808 w/e 12/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/305/1918
O1 (2-8-0)10/02/1945
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21894
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 20/02/1926
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/11/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Service Life 44 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Notes
Notes Into Crewe for cutting up 9/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 18/02/1926
CLK   Colwick on 06/03/1926
DON   Doncaster on 24/04/1926
LNG   Langwith Junction on 14/05/1943
GOR   Gorton on 25/02/1945
CLK   Colwick on 18/08/1946
GOR   Gorton on 20/10/1946
38B   Annesley on 16/07/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 17/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GOR Gorton w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 16/07/1950
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 17/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1045)
18/01/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1301)
17/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 818)
07/04/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1209)
23/05/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1062)
23/05/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
18/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3224)
24/08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1252)
26/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3206)
10/02/1945 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5024)
20/09/1947 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5043)
12/11/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5031)
23/02/1952 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28373)
27/03/1954 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28362)
12/05/1956 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28303)
14/10/1961 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28886)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 26/12/1925 20/02/1926 57 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6519
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1927 26/11/1927 43 days General    
Gorton Works 21/12/1929 18/01/1930 29 days General Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1931 17/10/1931 22 days General Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1934 07/04/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1936 23/05/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 04/06/1938 18/06/1938 15 days General Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 24/08/1940 8 days General Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/08/1942 26/09/1942 29 days General Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1944 10/02/1945 78 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1947 20/09/1947 49 days General Boiler number 5043 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1948 25/09/1948 14 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 19/10/1949 12/11/1949 25 days General Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63808
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1950 21/09/1950 3 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 31/12/1951 23/02/1952 55 days General Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 26/02/1952 27/02/1952 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 13/04/1952 01/05/1952 19 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 25/02/1954 27/03/1954 31 days General Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 08/11/1954 04/12/1954 27 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 21/02/1955 26/03/1955 34 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 05/04/1956 12/05/1956 38 days General Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 09/01/1957 09/02/1957 32 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 16/01/1959 21/02/1959 37 days Light Intermediate    
Gorton Works 07/09/1961 14/10/1961 38 days General Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212
14/08/1963 Crewe Works (Scrap Road) Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. SLS/196309

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1917
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21894
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2892    
08/1921 Allocation      
26/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6519
   
18/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
20/02/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
06/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
15/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927.    
21/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15)
   
26/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
   
24/03/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 07/04/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 15)
   
09/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 23/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
04/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3224 (Diagram 15)
   
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15)
   
29/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1942. Dep: 26/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3206 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 10/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5024 (Diagram 100A)
   
25/02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3808    
18/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1947. Dep: 20/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5043 (Diagram 100A)
   
12/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948.    
19/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 5031 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63808
   
16/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
19/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/09/1950. Dep: 21/09/1950.    
31/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1951. Dep: 23/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28373 (Diagram 100A)
   
26/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1952. Dep: 27/02/1952.    
13/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1952. Dep: 01/05/1952.    
25/02/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28362 (Diagram 100A)
   
08/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954.    
21/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955.    
05/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1956. Dep: 12/05/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28303 (Diagram 100A)
   
09/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957.    
16/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959.    
07/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A)
   
17/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63808 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev