Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 493 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6104 Week
» 17150 Month
» 17150 Year
» 1682526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1920 m/e 05/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6602   30/07/1927
War Dept. 780   04/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21897
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 02/08/1927
Withdrawal Sat 04/10/1941 off Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 780 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1918
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 02/08/1927
STV Staveley (G.C.) on 31/01/1934
   Withdrawn on 04/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1141)
02/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1858)
15/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1285)
10/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1456)
12/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3303)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3215)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 30/04/1927 30/07/1927 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6602
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 26/10/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 19/03/1932 02/04/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1935 15/06/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 1285 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 10/04/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 1456 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1939 12/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3303 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1941 04/10/1941 11 days General
Boiler number 3215 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 780
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1920
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21897
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
02/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/08/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
31/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
04/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 780 from Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    

prev prev