Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 406 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2571 Week
» 2571 Month
» 69433 Year
» 1734809 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1922 m/e 05/1918
London and North Western Railway 2954 m/e 06/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6520   13/03/1926
War Dept. 723   09/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21899
To Service During 05/1918
Taken into Stock 13/03/1926
Withdrawal Tue 09/09/1941 off March (MAR)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 723 and sent to the Middle East via Birkenhead, 16/9/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   06/1920
GOR   Gorton on 13/03/1926
RET   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 22/03/1926
MAR   March on 01/03/1929
CAM   Cambridge on 25/10/1931
MAR   March on 05/12/1936
     Withdrawn on 09/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1110)
31/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1859)
09/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1483)
06/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1940)
25/09/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1169)
06/05/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 818)
16/08/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 655)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 02/01/1926 13/03/1926 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6520
 
Gorton Works 28/07/1928 01/09/1928 36 days General    
Gorton Works 03/05/1930 31/05/1930 29 days General Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1932 09/07/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 06/07/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 25/09/1937 22 days General Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1939 06/05/1939 15 days Heavy Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1941 16/08/1941 12 days General Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1922
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21899
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
06/1920 Allocation      
06/1920 Renumbered Renumbered to 2954    
02/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6520
   
13/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/03/1926 To Stock To LNER stock    
22/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
28/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928.    
01/03/1929 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
03/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15)
   
25/10/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
25/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15)
   
22/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15)
   
05/12/1936 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15)
   
22/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
   
05/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15)
   
09/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 723 from March (MAR)    
09/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 723    

prev prev