|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/01/1926 | 13/03/1926 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6520 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/07/1928 | 01/09/1928 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1930 | 31/05/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1932 | 09/07/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1935 | 06/07/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/09/1937 | 25/09/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1939 | 06/05/1939 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/08/1941 | 16/08/1941 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1922 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21899 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
06/1920 | Allocation | |||
06/1920 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2954 | ||
02/01/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6520 |
||
13/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/03/1926 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
22/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
28/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1928. Dep: 01/09/1928. | ||
01/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 31/05/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1859 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
25/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1483 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1940 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/12/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
04/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/04/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 22/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/08/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1941. Dep: 16/08/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 655 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 723 from March (MAR) | ||
09/09/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 723 |