Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 46 Today
» 838 Yesterday
» 5603 Week
» 16748 Month
» 116533 Year
» 1781909 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1923 m/e 06/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6265   08/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3812   16/06/1946
British Railways 63812 w/e 29/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21900
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 08/03/1924
Withdrawal Fri 08/05/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Service Life 40 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 9/5/59

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1918
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 08/03/1924
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 23/11/1940
WFD   Woodford Halse on 30/01/1943
WHL   West Hartlepool on 08/03/1943
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 05/03/1945
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 20/09/1951
38A   Colwick on 23/09/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
36B   Mexborough on 29/01/1956
     Withdrawn on 08/05/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   on 08/05/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1290)
20/09/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1225)
17/01/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1773)
13/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1283)
27/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1874)
06/11/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 819)
11/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3396)
03/02/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3411)
22/03/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3328)
29/01/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3233)
05/05/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22183)
11/07/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22171)
19/11/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22175)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 08/03/1924 22 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6265
 
Gorton Works 28/06/1924 20/09/1924 85 days General Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1926 31/12/1926 63 days General    
Gorton Works 16/02/1929 16/03/1929 29 days General    
Gorton Works 27/12/1930 17/01/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1933 13/05/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 27/07/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/10/1937 06/11/1937 8 days General Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 11/05/1940 8 days General Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1943 06/03/1943 15 days General    
Gorton Works 06/01/1945 03/02/1945 29 days General Boiler number 3411 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1947 22/03/1947 22 days General Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1949 29/01/1949 15 days General Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63812
 
Gorton Works 14/04/1951 05/05/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22183 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/06/1953 11/07/1953 15 days General Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1955 19/11/1955 29 days General Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1923
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21900
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 08/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6265
   
08/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
08/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
28/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1924. Dep: 20/09/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926.    
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929.    
27/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/12/1930. Dep: 17/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1773 (Diagram 15)
   
06/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 13/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1283 (Diagram 15)
   
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1874 (Diagram 15)
   
30/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 819 (Diagram 15)
   
04/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
   
23/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
30/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943.    
08/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
06/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1945. Dep: 03/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3411 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
16/06/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3812    
01/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3328 (Diagram 15)
   
15/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1949. Dep: 29/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3233 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63812
   
14/04/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22183 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
23/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
27/06/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1953. Dep: 11/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15)
   
22/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1955. Dep: 19/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22175 (Diagram 15)
   
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
08/05/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63812 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev