Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 708 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6635 Week
» 5373 Month
» 419694 Year
» 1641259 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1925 m/e 06/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6604   21/08/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3813   24/11/1946
British Railways 63813 w/e 09/09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21902
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 21/08/1928
Withdrawal Sun 07/03/1965 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Scrapping Arnott Young (Parkgate)
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 4 dys

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Arnott Young, Parkgate, 5/65

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1918
NWE New England on 21/08/1928
GRA Grantham on 19/01/1931
DON Doncaster on 21/11/1942
CLK Colwick on 06/09/1943
DON Doncaster on 23/01/1944
FRO Frodingham on 02/12/1945
DON Doncaster on 07/04/1946
MEX Mexborough on 25/08/1946
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 22/09/1963
41H Staveley (G.C.) on 10/01/1965
   Withdrawn on 07/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FRO Frodingham m/e 31/01/1946
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
ALLOC 41H Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 06/02/1965
WDN   w/e 07/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1275)
01/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1162)
09/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 924)
14/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1399)
14/10/1938 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
25/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3249)
22/11/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 934)
05/05/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3297)
01/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3212)
09/09/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22101)
09/05/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22166)
02/02/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22209)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 21/08/1928 39 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6604
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1930 23/09/1930 61 days General  
Gorton Works 10/02/1933 01/04/1933 51 days General
Boiler number 1162 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1935 09/11/1935 39 days General
Boiler number 924 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/08/1938 14/10/1938 69 days General
Boiler number 1399 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1938 01/11/1938 7 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 25/04/1940 25/05/1940 31 days General
Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1942 22/11/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 06/12/1942 19/12/1942 14 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 22/05/1944 17/06/1944 27 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 14/03/1945 05/05/1945 53 days General
Boiler number 3297 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/09/1947 01/11/1947 44 days General
Boiler number 3212 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1950 09/09/1950 27 days General
Boiler number 22101 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63813
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1950 26/09/1950 10 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 17/04/1953 09/05/1953 23 days General
Boiler number 22166 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1956 02/02/1957 37 days General
Boiler number 22209 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1960 03/12/1960 39 days Heavy Intermediate  
Gorton Works 10/12/1960 17/12/1960 8 days Unclassified  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Works Sidings) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1925
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21902
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
21/08/1928 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
21/08/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
19/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
21/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO)    
07/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
25/08/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
24/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3813    
22/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
10/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    
07/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63813 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev