Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 48 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1885 Week
» 13030 Month
» 112815 Year
» 1778191 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1927 m/e 06/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6605   21/01/1928
War Dept. 764   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21904
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 17/01/1928
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 19 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 764 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1918
LNG   Langwith Junction on 17/01/1928
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1263)
07/06/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1340)
21/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1290)
06/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1154)
31/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1872)
22/07/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3282)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 08/10/1927 21/01/1928 106 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6605
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1930 07/06/1930 36 days General Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1932 21/05/1932 8 days General Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1934 06/10/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/10/1936 31/10/1936 8 days General Boiler number 1872 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/07/1939 22/07/1939 15 days General Boiler number 3282 (Diagram 15)
 
Doncaster Works 29/08/1941 13/09/1941 16 days General    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1927
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21904
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
08/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1927. Dep: 21/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6605
   
17/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
17/01/1928 To Stock To ROD stock    
03/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1340 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 21/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1290 (Diagram 15)
   
22/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1154 (Diagram 15)
   
24/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1872 (Diagram 15)
   
08/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/07/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3282 (Diagram 15)
   
29/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.    
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 764 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    
19/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 764    

prev prev