Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 484 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6095 Week
» 17141 Month
» 17141 Year
» 1682517 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1928 m/e 06/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6266   09/02/1924
War Dept. 777   04/10/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21905
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 09/02/1924
Withdrawal Sat 04/10/1941 off Langwith Junction (LNG)
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Notes
Notes Renumbered 777 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1918
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 15/02/1924
ARD Ardsley on 02/02/1925
NWE New England on 23/02/1925
CLK Colwick on 18/03/1925
MAR March on 03/07/1925
DON Doncaster on 10/07/1925
ANN Annesley on 18/08/1925
LNG Langwith Junction on 23/05/1938
   Withdrawn on 04/10/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1204)
02/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1158)
23/11/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1362)
24/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1756)
23/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1068)
03/04/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1019)
26/08/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3376)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1201)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/02/1924 09/02/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6266
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1924 02/08/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1927 07/01/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 12/10/1929 23/11/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 1362 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1932 24/12/1932 8 days General
Boiler number 1756 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1935 23/03/1935 8 days General
Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 03/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1939 26/08/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 3376 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1941 04/10/1941 13 days General
Boiler number 1201 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 777
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1928
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21905
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
15/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
23/02/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
18/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
03/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
10/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
23/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
04/10/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 777 from Langwith Junction (LNG)    

prev prev