Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 978 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 4303 Week
» 4303 Month
» 71165 Year
» 1736541 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1929 m/e 06/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6606   25/08/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3816   27/11/1946
British Railways 63816 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/306/1918
O4/5 (2-8-0)30/09/1939
O4/8 (2-8-0)03/12/1955
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21906
To Service During 06/1918
Taken into Stock 25/08/1927
Withdrawal Sat 15/01/1966 off Colwick (16B)
Service Life 47 yrs, 7 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Cohens (Kettering)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to George Cohen, Kettering, 3/66

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1918
NWE   New England on 25/08/1927
GRA   Grantham on 31/05/1935
CLK   Colwick on 10/09/1935
WHL   West Hartlepool on 20/01/1944
NPT   Newport (Teeside) on 05/10/1944
WHL   West Hartlepool on 18/10/1944
HLS   Hull Springhead on 12/01/1945
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 29/04/1946
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 02/09/1951
38A   Colwick on 23/09/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
     Withdrawn on 15/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 15/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1150)
03/09/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1945)
11/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1939)
02/03/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1255)
08/05/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1068)
30/09/1939 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3654)
11/12/1943 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 3651)
08/12/1945 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 1084)
11/08/1951 Diagram 15A boiler fitted (number 22341)
03/12/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28886)
09/09/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28933)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 16/07/1927 25/08/1927 41 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6606
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1930 03/09/1930 61 days General Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/01/1933 11/03/1933 44 days General Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1935 02/03/1935 32 days General Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/04/1937 08/05/1937 27 days General Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1939 30/09/1939 68 days General Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1941 10/05/1941 49 days General    
Gorton Works 13/11/1943 11/12/1943 29 days General Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1945 08/12/1945 30 days Heavy Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1948 06/11/1948 51 days General Renumbered to BR 63816
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1951 11/08/1951 47 days General Boiler number 22341 (Diagram 15A)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1953 14/11/1953 52 days General    
Gorton Works 08/09/1955 03/12/1955 87 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1956 29/06/1956 23 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 30/06/1958 23/08/1958 55 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 09/08/1960 09/09/1960 32 days General Boiler number 28933 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 20/09/1960 26/09/1960 7 days General    
Gorton Works 21/01/1961 26/01/1961 6 days Unclassified Tender weatherboard fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1966 Colwick MPD Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. SLS/196603

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1929
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21906
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1927. Dep: 25/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6606
   
25/08/1927 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
25/08/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
05/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1930. Dep: 03/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
   
27/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1939 (Diagram 15)
   
30/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1935. Dep: 02/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1255 (Diagram 15)
   
31/05/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Grantham (GRA)    
10/09/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1937. Dep: 08/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1068 (Diagram 15)
   
25/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/5
Boiler number 3654 (Diagram 15A)
   
23/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1941. Dep: 10/05/1941.    
13/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1943. Dep: 11/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3651 (Diagram 15A)
   
20/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
05/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
18/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
12/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
09/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/11/1945. Dep: 08/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1084 (Diagram 15A)
   
29/04/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
27/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3816    
17/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1948. Dep: 06/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63816
   
26/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22341 (Diagram 15A)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
23/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1953. Dep: 14/11/1953.    
08/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1955. Dep: 03/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28886 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/06/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1956. Dep: 29/06/1956.    
30/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/06/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958.    
09/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1960. Dep: 09/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28933 (Diagram 100A)
   
20/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1960. Dep: 26/09/1960.    
21/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/01/1961. Dep: 26/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Tender weatherboard fitted
   
15/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63816 from Colwick (16B)    

prev prev