|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/02/1924 | 02/02/1924 | 1 day | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6263 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1924 | 10/01/1925 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/06/1927 | 16/07/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1929 | 06/07/1929 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1931 | 11/07/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1934 | 24/02/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/08/1938 | 24/09/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/10/1940 | 02/11/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1943 | 26/06/1943 | 10 days | General | Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1945 | 14/04/1945 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1947 | 01/03/1947 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1949 | 22/01/1949 | 5 days | Light Casual | Renumbered to BR 63817 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1949 | 01/07/1949 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1949 | 23/07/1949 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/04/1951 | 12/05/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/04/1952 | 05/06/1952 | 52 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1952 | 09/06/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1952 | 23/01/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/01/1954 | 30/01/1954 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1954 | 08/01/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/03/1956 | 20/04/1956 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1957 | 09/02/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1959 | 01/05/1959 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1961 | 02/12/1961 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28971 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1961 | 13/12/1961 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1962 | Annesley MPD | The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. | SLS/196212 |
14/08/1963 | Crewe Works (Scrap Road) | Erecting Shop: D1030-34, D1073, D1550-58 UC (in various stages), D202/24/32/36/87, D316, 46230, 46442, 44812/96, 44936, 45070/94, 45310/40, 45421/31, 48121/64, 48766, 70018/50, 73166, 90384, 92014/56/83/105/113/133/154/167/173/191. Outside Erecting Shop: 44674, 45414/51, 48409, 82038, 12134/240. Stripped down in Yard: 92084/132/151/162. Dismantling Shed: 49448, 64791, 64907, 90095. On Scrap Road: 63808/17/65. Yard: D215/98, D338/344, 42151, 44826/909/81, 45218/305/398, 48035/133/296/751/770, 70004/21, 73025, 75000, 84012, 92100. Electric and Diesel Shop: 26057, 27002/4. Paint Shop: D1069/70/71/72, 45295, 45573, 49395, 26010, 1439 and Lion. Outside Paint Shop: D227/90, D335/79, D8007/21, 45283, 48502/618/709, 70020, 92020/40/86/123/192. On 21st July, Royal Scot 46151 was in the dismantling shed being broken-up, and 46152 was in the erecting shop having a casual. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1933 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21910 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
02/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
02/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/02/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6263 |
||
15/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
16/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
06/09/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1924. Dep: 10/01/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1366 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
04/06/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1927. Dep: 16/07/1927. | ||
20/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 06/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1168 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1931. Dep: 11/07/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1860 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 24/02/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1464 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
27/08/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1938. Dep: 24/09/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3344 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/09/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
12/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1940. Dep: 02/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3394 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
03/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1945. Dep: 14/04/1945. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5036 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. | ||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3817 | ||
12/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1947. Dep: 01/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5013 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/01/1949. Dep: 22/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 63817 |
||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 01/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5082 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/07/1949. Dep: 23/07/1949. | ||
26/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (38B) | ||
17/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 12/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28811 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/04/1952. Dep: 05/06/1952. | ||
07/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1952. Dep: 09/06/1952. | ||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 23/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28391 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/01/1954. Dep: 30/01/1954. | ||
02/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28388 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956. | ||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 09/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28358 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/04/1959. Dep: 01/05/1959. | ||
25/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1961. Dep: 02/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28971 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/12/1961. Dep: 13/12/1961. | ||
17/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63817 from Annesley (16D) |