Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 44 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4763 Week
» 15908 Month
» 115693 Year
» 1781069 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1939 m/e 08/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6607   15/10/1927
War Dept. 722   20/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L693
Works Number 21916
To Service During 08/1918
Taken into Stock 11/10/1927
Withdrawal Sat 20/09/1941 off Heaton (HTN)
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 722 and sent to the Middle East via Glasgow, 8/10/41

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1918
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 11/10/1927
HLS   Hull Springhead on 02/01/1930
DAR   Darlington on 06/01/1940
HTN   Heaton on 20/02/1940
     Withdrawn on 20/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1200)
10/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1966)
22/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1277)
26/06/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1115)
21/10/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1174)
13/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1964)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 09/07/1927 15/10/1927 99 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6607
 
Darlington Works 28/04/1930 12/08/1930 107 days General    
Gorton Works 27/05/1933 10/06/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1935 22/06/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1277 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1937 26/06/1937 15 days General Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1939 21/10/1939 15 days General Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
 
Darlington Works 09/02/1940 21/02/1940 13 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 01/09/1941 13/09/1941 13 days General Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1939
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21916
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6607
   
11/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/10/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
02/01/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
28/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1930. Dep: 12/08/1930.    
27/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1933. Dep: 10/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1966 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1277 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 26/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15)
   
07/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1939. Dep: 21/10/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1174 (Diagram 15)
   
06/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
09/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/02/1940. Dep: 21/02/1940.    
20/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
01/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1964 (Diagram 15)
   
20/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 722 from Heaton (HTN)    
20/09/1941 Renumbered Renumbered to 722    

prev prev