Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 856 Today
» 919 Yesterday
» 3685 Week
» 4624 Month
» 208114 Year
» 1873490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1690 m/e 12/1918
London and North Western Railway 2916 m/e 12/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6335   28/06/1924
War Dept. 740   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3738
To Service During 12/1918
Taken into Stock 28/06/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Staveley (G.C.) (STV)
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 20 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 740 and sent to the Middle East via Bidston 15/10/41
Lost at sea

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   12/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 26/06/1924
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 01/07/1924
STV   Staveley (G.C.) on 01/02/1934
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1340)
29/06/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 111)
28/03/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 934)
24/06/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1273)
27/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1866)
02/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 854)
18/05/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1006)
20/09/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 818)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 26/04/1924 28/06/1924 64 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6335
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1926 31/12/1926 49 days General    
Gorton Works 02/03/1929 29/06/1929 120 days General Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1931 28/03/1931 15 days General Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/06/1933 24/06/1933 22 days General Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/07/1935 27/07/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/09/1937 02/10/1937 29 days General Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1938 29/01/1938 8 days Light Repair After collision
 
Gorton Works 04/05/1940 18/05/1940 15 days General Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 20/09/1941 13 days General Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 740
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1690
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3738
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
12/1919 Allocation      
12/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2916    
08/1921 Allocation      
26/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1924. Dep: 28/06/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6335
   
26/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/06/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
01/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
13/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1926. Dep: 31/12/1926.    
02/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1929. Dep: 29/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 111 (Diagram 15)
   
14/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15)
   
03/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/06/1933. Dep: 24/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1273 (Diagram 15)
   
01/02/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
13/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1866 (Diagram 15)
   
04/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 854 (Diagram 15)
   
22/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1938. Dep: 29/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
04/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1006 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 20/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 818 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 740
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 740 from Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    

prev prev