|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/03/1924 | 12/04/1924 | 15 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6316 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1924 | 27/09/1924 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1927 | 28/05/1927 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1929 | 24/09/1929 | 60 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1931 | 12/12/1931 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/03/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 8 days | General | Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1936 | 11/07/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1939 | 16/09/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/03/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 16 days | General | Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/05/1944 | 03/06/1944 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1945 | 22/12/1945 | 1 day | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1946 | 23/02/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 26/07/1947 | 16/08/1947 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1950 | 11/02/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63714 |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1952 | 05/07/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1955 | 07/05/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1694 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3742 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
29/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 12/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6316 |
||
10/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1429 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
26/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1927. Dep: 28/05/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 803 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/07/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 24/09/1929. | ||
21/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1931. Dep: 12/12/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1062 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. Work undertaken: Altered spring gear for working to Whitemoor Boiler number 1034 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3250 (Diagram 15) |
||
26/08/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1939. Dep: 16/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1104 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
20/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1944. Dep: 03/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/12/1945. Dep: 22/12/1945. | ||
16/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3714 | ||
26/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1947. Dep: 16/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3263 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1950. Dep: 11/02/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 811 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63714 |
||
14/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1952. Dep: 05/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22275 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1955. Dep: 07/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22269 (Diagram 15) |
||
20/03/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63714 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |