Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 86 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5561 Week
» 5561 Month
» 72423 Year
» 1737799 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1697 m/e 03/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6314   21/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3717   28/07/1946
British Railways 63717 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/303/1919
O4/8 (2-8-0)22/03/1958
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3745
To Service During 03/1919
Taken into Stock 21/03/1924
Withdrawal Sun 04/04/1965 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 46 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to J Cashmore, Great Bridge, 5/65

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1919
GOR   Gorton on 27/03/1924
CLK   Colwick on 05/04/1924
NWE   New England on 27/11/1925
DON   Doncaster on 08/11/1934
MEX   Mexborough on 25/07/1943
40E   Langwith Junction on 02/07/1950
     Withdrawn on 04/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1338)
26/02/1925 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1363)
10/08/1927 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1774)
28/04/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1196)
05/07/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)
26/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)
08/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1029)
14/09/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 927)
10/03/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3396)
03/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3414)
30/12/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22146)
31/01/1953 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22144)
09/07/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22153)
22/03/1958 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28947)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 21/03/1924 7 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6314
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1925 26/02/1925 46 days General Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1927 10/08/1927 33 days General Boiler number 1774 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1929 04/10/1929 57 days General    
Gorton Works 23/03/1932 28/04/1932 37 days General Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1934 05/07/1934 27 days General Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1936 26/09/1936 35 days General Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1938 08/10/1938 58 days General Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/08/1940 14/09/1940 30 days General Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1942 30/01/1943 53 days General    
Gorton Works 15/08/1943 11/09/1943 28 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 31/01/1945 10/03/1945 39 days General Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1947 03/10/1947 41 days General Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1947 24/10/1947 14 days Unclassified    
Doncaster Works 06/09/1948 04/10/1948 29 days Light Repair Renumbered to BR 63717
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1950 30/12/1950 41 days General Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/01/1951 04/01/1951 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 09/01/1953 31/01/1953 23 days General Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/12/1954 05/02/1955 55 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 13/06/1955 09/07/1955 27 days General Boiler number 22153 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1958 22/03/1958 47 days General Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28947 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1958 28/06/1958 10 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 16/09/1958 27/09/1958 12 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 03/06/1961 09/08/1961 68 days Light Intermediate    
Gorton Works 24/04/1962 19/05/1962 26 days Light Casual    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1697
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3745
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 21/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6314
   
21/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
27/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
05/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
12/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1925. Dep: 26/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1363 (Diagram 15)
   
27/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
09/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 10/08/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1774 (Diagram 15)
   
09/08/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1929. Dep: 04/10/1929.    
23/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1932. Dep: 28/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1196 (Diagram 15)
   
09/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1934. Dep: 05/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1367 (Diagram 15)
   
08/11/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
   
12/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1938. Dep: 08/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15)
   
16/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1940. Dep: 14/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 927 (Diagram 15)
   
09/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943.    
25/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/08/1943. Dep: 11/09/1943.    
31/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1945. Dep: 10/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3396 (Diagram 15)
   
28/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3717    
24/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1947. Dep: 03/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3414 (Diagram 15)
   
11/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 24/10/1947.    
06/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/09/1948. Dep: 04/10/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63717
   
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
20/11/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1950. Dep: 30/12/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22146 (Diagram 15)
   
03/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/01/1951. Dep: 04/01/1951.    
09/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15)
   
13/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/12/1954. Dep: 05/02/1955.    
13/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1955. Dep: 09/07/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22153 (Diagram 15)
   
04/02/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1958. Dep: 22/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28947 (Diagram 100A)
   
19/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1958. Dep: 28/06/1958.    
16/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1958. Dep: 27/09/1958.    
03/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1961. Dep: 09/08/1961.    
24/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/04/1962. Dep: 19/05/1962.    
04/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 63717 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev