|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1924 | 29/03/1924 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6313 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1924 | 07/02/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1927 | 02/07/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/11/1929 | 14/12/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1932 | 30/01/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1934 | 14/04/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1936 | 04/04/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1936 | 19/12/1936 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 20/10/1938 | 05/11/1938 | 17 days | General | Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/04/1943 | 15/05/1943 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/02/1944 | 26/02/1944 | 9 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1945 | 27/10/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/06/1947 | 28/06/1947 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 15/05/1948 | 05/06/1948 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63718 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1950 | 23/12/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1952 | 03/01/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1956 | 09/06/1956 | 71 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1958 | 19/04/1958 | 43 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1958 | 09/08/1958 | 1 day | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1960 | 07/05/1960 | 43 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1960 | 21/05/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/08/1963 | Doncaster Works (Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3085/6/95, D1507/13/4. Crimpsall Diesel Bay: 12111, D2570, D3160, D3620/2/36/9/49/81/93, D5037/45, D5502, D5649/67/73/82, D5852, D6713/4, D6801, D8229, D9015/7/20. Crimpsall Steam Bay: 60009/65/94, 62011/22, 90015/313/471 and Dept. 11 (68914). Yard: 12135, D2407, D3159, D3495, D3632, D5500/12/48/52/8/72/96, D5610/47/83, D6721, 60008/14/22/32/46/97, 60830, 63678, 63704/18, 68925, 69523, 90269/502. Paint Shop: 60800. Outside Weigh House: D5068, D5659, D6864, 90449. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1699 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3747 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
08/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 29/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6313 |
||
27/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
29/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
05/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1218 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/11/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
21/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1927. Dep: 02/07/1927. | ||
09/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929. | ||
09/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 30/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 821 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/03/1932 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
24/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1934. Dep: 14/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1318 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1942 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
12/12/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936. | ||
20/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3236 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1943 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1944. Dep: 26/02/1944. | ||
29/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3298 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3718 | ||
14/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 28/06/1947. | ||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
29/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
03/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
15/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1948. Dep: 05/06/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3253 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63718 |
||
26/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
01/04/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) | ||
02/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1950. Dep: 23/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22144 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/08/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
06/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
06/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1952. Dep: 03/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22109 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1956. Dep: 09/06/1956. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28273 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/03/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958. | ||
09/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1958. Dep: 09/08/1958. | ||
29/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
28/02/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
26/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1960. Dep: 07/05/1960. | ||
14/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960. | ||
10/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63718 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |