Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 940 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 4265 Week
» 4265 Month
» 71127 Year
» 1736503 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1700 m/e 04/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6315   05/04/1924
War Dept. 759   19/09/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
Order Number E107
Works Number 3748
To Service During 04/1919
Taken into Stock 05/04/1924
Withdrawal Fri 19/09/1941 off Gorton (GOR)
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 19 dys

Disposal

Notes
Notes Renumbered 759 and sent to the Middle East

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1919
GOR   Gorton on 10/04/1924
LIV   Brunswick on 26/10/1936
GOR   Gorton on 08/01/1938
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1941

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1367)
16/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1488)
11/05/1929 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1167)
09/05/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 179)
25/03/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1110)
09/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1059)
09/02/1935 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
29/08/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1179)
07/01/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3239)
04/10/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3379)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 22/03/1924 05/04/1924 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6315
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1924 16/08/1924 64 days General Boiler number 1488 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1925 14/11/1925 43 days General    
Gorton Works 09/04/1927 21/05/1927 43 days General    
Gorton Works 02/02/1929 11/05/1929 99 days General Boiler number 1167 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1931 09/05/1931 22 days General Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 25/03/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/02/1935 09/02/1935 8 days General Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1936 29/08/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1938 07/01/1939 22 days General Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/09/1941 04/10/1941 17 days General Boiler number 3379 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 759
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1700
Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3748
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
22/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/03/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6315
   
05/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/06/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1924. Dep: 16/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1488 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925.    
09/04/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927.    
02/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1167 (Diagram 15)
   
18/04/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1931. Dep: 09/05/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 179 (Diagram 15)
   
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 25/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1110 (Diagram 15)
   
02/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/02/1935. Dep: 09/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1059 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
15/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1179 (Diagram 15)
   
26/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Brunswick (LIV)    
08/01/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 07/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3239 (Diagram 15)
   
18/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/09/1941. Dep: 04/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3379 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to WD 759
   
19/09/1941 Withdrawn Condemned as 759 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev