Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 84 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5559 Week
» 5559 Month
» 72421 Year
» 1737797 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1943 m/e 10/1918
London and North Western Railway 2888 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6521   31/10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3821   03/11/1946
British Railways 63821 w/e 14/01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L703
Works Number 22001
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 31/10/1925
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Sheffield Darnall (41A)
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 29 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Horwich)

Notes
Notes Into Horwich for cut up 6/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1918
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
GOR   Gorton on 29/10/1925
WFD   Woodford Halse on 07/11/1925
CLK   Colwick on 04/02/1926
DON   Doncaster on 23/01/1944
WFD   Woodford Halse on 07/09/1944
SHF   Sheffield Darnall on 03/02/1946
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall m/e 28/02/1946
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1053)
24/10/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1855)
12/05/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1957)
12/05/1934 Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
05/09/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1869)
22/04/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1965)
29/11/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3299)
11/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3243)
04/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1256)
14/01/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3214)
07/06/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22273)
21/05/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22114)
13/09/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22273)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 08/08/1925 31/10/1925 85 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6521
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1928 22/12/1928 29 days General    
Gorton Works 03/10/1931 24/10/1931 22 days General Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/04/1934 12/05/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 05/09/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1939 22/04/1939 22 days General Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1940 13/04/1940 29 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 19/11/1941 29/11/1941 11 days General Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1944 11/03/1944 19 days General Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1947 04/10/1947 22 days General Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1949 14/01/1950 22 days General Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63821
 
Gorton Works 17/01/1950 19/01/1950 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 24/05/1952 07/06/1952 15 days General Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1952 19/06/1952 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 23/04/1955 21/05/1955 29 days General Boiler number 22114 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1955 24/05/1955 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 16/08/1958 13/09/1958 29 days General Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1958 17/10/1958 25 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1943
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22001
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2888    
08/1921 Allocation      
08/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6521
   
29/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/10/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/11/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
04/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
24/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928.    
03/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1855 (Diagram 15)
   
28/04/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1934. Dep: 12/05/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1957 (Diagram 15)
Empire twin plunger Lubricator fitted to axles
   
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 05/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1869 (Diagram 15)
   
01/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 22/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1965 (Diagram 15)
   
16/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940.    
19/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1941. Dep: 29/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3299 (Diagram 15)
   
23/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
22/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1944. Dep: 11/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3243 (Diagram 15)
   
07/09/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/02/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3821    
13/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 04/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1256 (Diagram 15)
   
24/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1949. Dep: 14/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3214 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63821
   
17/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 19/01/1950.    
24/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1952. Dep: 07/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1952. Dep: 19/06/1952.    
23/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22114 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/05/1955. Dep: 24/05/1955.    
16/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22273 (Diagram 15)
   
23/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/09/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958.    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63821 from Sheffield Darnall (41A)    

prev prev