|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 31/03/1928 | 30/06/1928 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6608 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/06/1930 | 16/09/1930 | 82 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1932 | 07/01/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/09/1933 | 07/10/1933 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1935 | 06/04/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1937 | 19/06/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/02/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/03/1942 | 04/04/1942 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1947 | 21/06/1947 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1948 | 11/09/1948 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63823 |
||
Gorton Works | 18/08/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1954 | 27/01/1954 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 28/09/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 36 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28937 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1961 | 27/05/1961 | 36 days | Heavy Intermediate | Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1949 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22007 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/1919 | Allocation | |||
12/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2944 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
31/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6608 |
||
30/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
30/06/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
02/01/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
27/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1930. Dep: 16/09/1930. | ||
24/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1932. Dep: 07/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/09/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1933. Dep: 07/10/1933. | ||
23/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1115 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
05/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/06/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1004 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
24/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1942. Dep: 04/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1225 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
29/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3823 | ||
24/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947. | ||
14/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 11/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63823 |
||
18/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22213 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W) | ||
16/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
22/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
09/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
29/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tuxford (40D) | ||
27/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
19/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22197 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 27/01/1954. | ||
28/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28937 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1961. Dep: 27/05/1961. Work undertaken: Water Treatment apparatus fitted |
||
08/08/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63823 from Ardsley (56B) |