|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/03/1924 | 22/03/1924 | 22 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6260 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1924 | 19/07/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/02/1927 | 26/03/1927 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/12/1928 | 16/03/1929 | 85 days | General | Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/12/1932 | 31/12/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/12/1934 | 22/12/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/04/1937 | 17/04/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/07/1939 | 29/07/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1940 | 31/12/1940 | 26 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1941 | 11/10/1941 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1975 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22033 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
01/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1924. Dep: 22/03/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6260 |
||
22/03/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/03/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
10/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1924. Dep: 19/07/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1224 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1927. Dep: 26/03/1927. | ||
22/12/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1928. Dep: 16/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1938 (Diagram 15) |
||
31/12/1930 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1269 boiler fitted | ||
17/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 31/12/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1879 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/12/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1934. Dep: 22/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1249 (Diagram 15) |
||
21/02/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
03/04/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1937. Dep: 17/04/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3286 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1939. Dep: 29/07/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1245 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1940. Dep: 31/12/1940. | ||
29/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1941. Dep: 11/10/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3374 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 775 from Frodingham (FRO) | ||
13/10/1941 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 775 |