Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 927 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1835 Week
» 12980 Month
» 112765 Year
» 1778141 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1976 m/e 10/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6611   29/10/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3835   12/10/1946
British Railways 63835 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22034
To Service During 10/1918
Taken into Stock 27/10/1927
Withdrawal Mon 23/02/1959 off Mexborough (41F)
Service Life 40 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1918
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 27/10/1927
YK   York (North) on 15/06/1928
BUL   Bullcroft Junction on 29/10/1929
HLS   Hull Springhead on 05/12/1931
CUD   Cudworth on 12/01/1934
HTN   Heaton on 12/06/1940
TDK   Tyne Dock on 23/07/1945
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 06/02/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
84B   Oxley (on loan) on 02/09/1951
38A   Colwick on 23/09/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
39A   Gorton on 21/03/1954
38A   Colwick on 04/07/1954
36B   Mexborough on 29/01/1956
     Withdrawn on 23/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 39A Gorton 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 17/07/1954
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   on 23/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1228)
10/12/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1355)
08/12/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1144)
17/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1190)
17/06/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1013)
08/03/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1041)
05/12/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3252)
18/11/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3319)
17/12/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3380)
23/08/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22288)
26/06/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22250)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 30/07/1927 29/10/1927 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6611
 
Darlington Works 16/12/1929 29/03/1930 104 days General    
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 10/12/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/12/1934 08/12/1934 8 days General Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1936 17/10/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1939 17/06/1939 8 days General Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1941 08/03/1941 15 days General Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1942 05/12/1942 22 days General Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1944 18/11/1944 15 days General Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1945 29/12/1945 22 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 15/03/1947 19/04/1947 36 days General    
Gorton Works 21/08/1948 04/09/1948 15 days Heavy Renumbered to BR 63835
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1949 17/12/1949 22 days General Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1951 24/11/1951 29 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 09/08/1952 23/08/1952 15 days General Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1952 09/09/1952 15 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 01/08/1953 08/08/1953 8 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 11/08/1953 12/08/1953 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 12/06/1954 26/06/1954 15 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 22250 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1954 02/07/1954 4 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 21/05/1955 02/07/1955 43 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 14/02/1959 14/02/1959 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1976
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22034
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6611
   
27/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
27/10/1927 To Stock To ROD stock    
15/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
29/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Bullcroft Junction (BUL)    
16/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1929. Dep: 29/03/1930.    
05/12/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1355 (Diagram 15)
   
12/01/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
01/12/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1144 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1190 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1013 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 08/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15)
   
14/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3252 (Diagram 15)
   
04/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3319 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
08/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/12/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945.    
12/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3835    
15/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947.    
21/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 21/08/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to BR 63835
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
26/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1949. Dep: 17/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Loaned to Oxley (84B)    
23/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
27/10/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/10/1951. Dep: 24/11/1951.    
09/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1952. Dep: 23/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15)
   
26/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1952. Dep: 09/09/1952.    
01/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/08/1953. Dep: 08/08/1953.    
11/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1953. Dep: 12/08/1953.    
21/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
12/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 12/06/1954. Dep: 26/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22250 (Diagram 15)
   
29/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1954. Dep: 02/07/1954.    
04/07/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
21/05/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/05/1955. Dep: 02/07/1955.    
29/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
14/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 14/02/1959. Dep: 14/02/1959.    
23/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63835 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev