Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 65 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2991 Week
» 4729 Month
» 132172 Year
» 1797548 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1981 m/e 11/1918
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6261   01/03/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3838   21/09/1946
British Railways 63838 w/e 04/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O1
Company History LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/311/1918
O1 (2-8-0)04/06/1949
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22039
To Service During 11/1918
Taken into Stock 01/03/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/10/1962 off Annesley (16D)
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Derby)

Notes
Notes Into Derby for cutting up 10/63

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1918
GOR   Gorton on 10/03/1924
SHF   Sheffield Neepsend on 15/03/1924
LNG   Langwith Junction on 14/01/1926
HLS   Hull Springhead on 24/05/1930
DON   Doncaster on 28/06/1933
BRN   Barnsley on 03/05/1939
STV   Staveley (G.C.) on 29/08/1943
ANN   Annesley on 19/06/1949
ANN   Annesley w/e 25/06/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 25/06/1949
LOAN 16D Annesley on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 16D Annesley on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 27/10/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1918 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1296)
09/08/1924 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1490)
10/05/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1336)
02/06/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1019)
23/02/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1252)
12/12/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1315)
18/02/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
07/03/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3304)
22/07/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1287)
09/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1081)
01/11/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3402)
04/06/1949 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 5112)
03/03/1951 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28297)
16/05/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28826)
29/04/1955 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28286)
01/06/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28350)
31/01/1962 Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 01/03/1924 15 days Light Repair Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6261
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1924 09/08/1924 71 days General Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/09/1927 22/10/1927 43 days General    
Gorton Works 12/04/1930 10/05/1930 29 days General Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
 
Darlington Works 02/05/1932 02/06/1932 32 days General Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1935 23/02/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/11/1936 12/12/1936 15 days General Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1939 18/02/1939 22 days General Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/02/1942 07/03/1942 12 days General Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/07/1944 22/07/1944 22 days General Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1946 09/11/1946 15 days General Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 25/10/1947 01/11/1947 8 days Heavy Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1949 04/06/1949 92 days General Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5112 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63838
 
Gorton Works 28/01/1951 03/03/1951 35 days General Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1951 20/03/1951 14 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 17/03/1952 17/05/1952 62 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 18/04/1953 16/05/1953 29 days General Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1955 29/04/1955 37 days General Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1955 08/07/1955 23 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 04/05/1957 01/06/1957 29 days General Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1958 20/09/1958 24 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 05/02/1959 28/02/1959 24 days Heavy Casual    
Gorton Works 16/08/1960 17/09/1960 33 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 06/01/1962 31/01/1962 26 days Light Casual Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212
31/10/1962 Annesley MPD The proposed transfer away of the O1s (displaced by the LMR 8Fs) has been cancelled and the Ols (including 4 just ex-Works) are to be withdrawn. 63777/92/6, 63838/86 were withdrawn w.e. 27/10 but were still at Annesley on 11/11 whilst the following are in store also 63578/9/91, 63610/76/89, 63711/40/52, 63777/92/6, 63806/8/17, 63838, 63854/65/7, 63886, 63889, 63901. Also stored are 84007/27 which used to work the so-called 'Annesley Dido'-replaced by a bus since 10th Sept. SLS/196212
16/10/1963 Derby Works (Foundry Row) Erecting Shop: No. 1 Bay-42486 cut-up, D92, D2508, D2910, D3050/5/82, D3323/67, 12037/43; Erecting Shop: No. 2 Bay-D87, D5000/17/33, D5134/8; Erecting Shop: No. 3 Bay-(new construction)-D5233-47new. Diesel Erecting Shop: D35, D46/9, D69, D74, D100/12/21/2/9/36/46, D5003. Finishing Shop: D9, D72, D147, D3089, D5004/22, D7577. Paint Shop: D91, D3054, D7574. Test House: D62/4/8, D115, D2505, D2902/7, D3335, D5015, D5216, D5393, D7572/5/6. Stone Pit: 44539. Foundry Row: 41537, 42500, 44176, 47679, 63806/38, D63, D2506, D2913, D3121, 10001, 12082. ED6 an ED7 dumped awaiting parts from J. Fowler. Yard: Klondyke, D52, D154, D7573 an ED4. SLS/196311

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1918 To Service To service as ROD Number 1981
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22039
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 01/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6261
   
01/03/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
15/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
31/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1490 (Diagram 15)
   
14/01/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
10/09/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/09/1927. Dep: 22/10/1927.    
12/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1930. Dep: 10/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1336 (Diagram 15)
   
24/05/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
02/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1932. Dep: 02/06/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1019 (Diagram 15)
   
28/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
09/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1252 (Diagram 15)
   
28/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15)
   
28/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1939. Dep: 18/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
03/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (BRN)    
24/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1942. Dep: 07/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3304 (Diagram 15)
   
29/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
01/07/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1944. Dep: 22/07/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1287 (Diagram 15)
   
21/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3838    
26/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1081 (Diagram 15)
   
25/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 01/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3402 (Diagram 15)
   
05/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1949. Dep: 04/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O1
Boiler number 5112 (Diagram 100A)
Renumbered to BR 63838
   
19/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
25/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
28/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1951. Dep: 03/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28297 (Diagram 100A)
   
07/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1951. Dep: 20/03/1951.    
17/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952.    
18/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1953. Dep: 16/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28826 (Diagram 100A)
   
24/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1955. Dep: 29/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28286 (Diagram 100A)
   
16/06/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/06/1955. Dep: 08/07/1955.    
04/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/05/1957. Dep: 01/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 28350 (Diagram 100A)
   
28/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958.    
05/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1959. Dep: 28/02/1959.    
16/08/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/08/1960. Dep: 17/09/1960.    
06/01/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/01/1962. Dep: 31/01/1962.
Work undertaken:
Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted
   
27/10/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63838 from Annesley (16D)    

prev prev