|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 05/04/1924 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6305 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1926 | 03/07/1926 | 71 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1928 | 02/06/1928 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1930 | 07/06/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1932 | 22/10/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/08/1934 | 25/08/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1939 | 23/09/1939 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/01/1942 | 07/02/1942 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/02/1944 | 04/03/1944 | 24 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/01/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1949 | 11/06/1949 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63839 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1952 | 22/03/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1952 | 25/10/1952 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1952 | 30/10/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 22/05/1954 | 05/06/1954 | 15 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1954 | 14/06/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1955 | 23/04/1955 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1956 | 02/02/1957 | 36 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1959 | 31/03/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/10/1958 | Colwich MPD - stored locomotives | 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). | SLS/195811 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1918 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1991 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22049 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2861 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6305 |
||
05/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
10/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
24/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 03/07/1926. | ||
28/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1928. Dep: 02/06/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1368 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/05/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1930. Dep: 07/06/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1148 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1932. Dep: 22/10/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1215 (Diagram 15) |
||
11/08/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
16/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 15) |
||
24/01/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/01/1942. Dep: 07/02/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3261 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1944. Dep: 04/03/1944. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3698 (Diagram 15D) |
||
07/09/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
13/10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3839 | ||
25/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3673 (Diagram 15D) |
||
22/12/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
21/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5102 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63839 |
||
27/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
11/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
08/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
14/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
09/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
19/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1952. Dep: 22/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22330 (Diagram 15D) |
||
11/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 11/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22313 (Diagram 15D) |
||
28/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/10/1952. Dep: 30/10/1952. | ||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 05/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22325 (Diagram 15D) |
||
08/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/06/1954. Dep: 14/06/1954. | ||
26/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/03/1955. Dep: 23/04/1955. | ||
29/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1956. Dep: 02/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22307 (Diagram 15D) |
||
31/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/03/1959. Dep: 31/03/1959. | ||
03/04/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63839 from Colwick (40E) |