Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 337 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 3690 Week
» 30311 Month
» 30311 Year
» 1695687 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1993 m/e 01/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6524   31/12/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3840   17/11/1946
British Railways 63840 m/e 30/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/301/1919
O4/8 (2-8-0)10/08/1957
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L704
Works Number 22051
To Service During 01/1919
Taken into Stock 31/12/1925
Withdrawal Wed 18/09/1963 off Langwith Junction (41J)
Service Life 44 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap 1/64

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1919
GOR Gorton on 31/12/1925
LNG Langwith Junction m/e 1934
91W To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 21/11/1940
WFD Woodford Halse on 12/01/1943
THJ Thornton Junction on 25/01/1943
MEX Mexborough on 01/10/1943
40E Langwith Junction on 02/07/1950
   Withdrawn on 18/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction w/e 02/07/1950
WDN   on 18/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1089)
07/02/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
01/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1177)
06/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3242)
06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 868)
08/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3324)
29/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 814)
06/01/1945 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3287)
01/10/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 865)
11/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22127)
13/12/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22885)
12/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22226)
10/08/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28933)
25/06/1960 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28936)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/12/1925 31/12/1925 23 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6524
 
Gorton Works 14/01/1928 02/1928   General  
Gorton Works 09/11/1929 07/03/1930 119 days General  
Gorton Works 09/01/1932 07/01/1932 -1 days General  
Gorton Works 26/04/1934 07/05/1934 12 days General  
Gorton Works 22/05/1936 06/06/1936 16 days General
Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/06/1938 06/1938   General  
Gorton Works 13/08/1940 07/08/1940 -5 days General  
Gorton Works 06/08/1942 29/08/1942 24 days General
Boiler number 814 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 07/12/1944 06/01/1945 31 days General
Boiler number 3287 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1947 01/10/1947 60 days General
Boiler number 865 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 15/10/1950 11/11/1950 28 days General
Boiler number 22127 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63840
 
Gorton Works 15/11/1950 22/11/1950 8 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 24/11/1952 13/12/1952 20 days General
Boiler number 22885 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1955 12/03/1955 50 days General
Boiler number 22226 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 18/03/1955 19/03/1955 2 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 23/05/1957 10/08/1957 80 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28933 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 04/10/1958 18/10/1958 15 days Unclassified  
Gorton Works 16/05/1960 25/06/1960 41 days General
Boiler number 28936 (Diagram 100A)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1993
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22051
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
31/12/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/12/1925 To Stock To LNER stock    
07/02/1928 Modification Diagram 15 number 853 boiler fitted    
01/1932 Modification Diagram 15 number 1177 boiler fitted    
1934 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
06/1938 Modification Diagram 15 number 868 boiler fitted    
08/1940 Modification Diagram 15 number 3324 boiler fitted    
21/11/1940 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
12/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
25/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ)    
01/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3840    
02/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
18/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 63840 from Langwith Junction (41J)    

prev prev