|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/01/1924 | 02/02/1924 | 7 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6257 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1924 | 13/06/1924 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1926 | 14/10/1926 | 88 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1928 | 16/11/1928 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1931 | 20/02/1931 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 69 days | General | Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1936 | 27/02/1936 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1938 | 13/08/1938 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1940 | 09/11/1940 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/01/1943 | 27/02/1943 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1945 | 30/06/1945 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1947 | 24/01/1948 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3842 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/02/1951 | 31/03/1951 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63842 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22120 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/07/1955 | 20/08/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/09/1957 | 12/10/1957 | 34 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Gorton Works | 28/10/1960 | 10/02/1961 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1998 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22056 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
27/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1924. Dep: 02/02/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6257 |
||
02/02/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
02/02/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
12/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1924. Dep: 13/06/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1131 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/07/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1926. Dep: 14/10/1926. | ||
22/10/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
10/08/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1928. Dep: 16/11/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1440 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1931. Dep: 20/02/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 932 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/08/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1328 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1936. Dep: 27/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1017 (Diagram 15) Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
04/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
17/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/10/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1940. Dep: 09/11/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1239 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1943. Dep: 27/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3425 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1945. Dep: 30/06/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3424 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3842 | ||
07/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1134 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3842 |
||
02/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) | ||
22/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1951. Dep: 31/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22171 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63842 |
||
02/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/09/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. | ||
11/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22120 (Diagram 15) |
||
07/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1955. Dep: 20/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22287 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/09/1957. Dep: 12/10/1957. | ||
28/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1960. Dep: 10/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22115 (Diagram 15) |
||
04/04/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63842 from Langwith Junction (41J) |