|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/05/1928 | 11/08/1928 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6612 |
||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1930 | 25/10/1930 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1932 | 24/01/1933 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1934 | 03/11/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1937 | 27/02/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1939 | 03/02/1940 | 53 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/02/1942 | 28/03/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/08/1943 | 21/08/1943 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1946 | 01/06/1946 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1947 | 21/01/1948 | 44 days | Heavy | |||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1949 | 05/11/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63843 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/12/1952 | 10/01/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1956 | 23/06/1956 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/12/1960 | 21/01/1961 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2000 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22058 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
12/05/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1928. Dep: 11/08/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6612 |
||
11/08/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
11/08/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
23/10/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
30/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1930. Dep: 25/10/1930. | ||
10/12/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1932. Dep: 24/01/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1188 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 03/11/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1301 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
06/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/12/1939. Dep: 03/02/1940. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/7 Boiler number 3660 (Diagram 15D) |
||
11/05/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL) | ||
21/02/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D) |
||
07/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/08/1943. Dep: 21/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3696 (Diagram 15D) |
||
05/03/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
29/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1946. Dep: 01/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3671 (Diagram 15D) |
||
24/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3843 | ||
09/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 09/12/1947. Dep: 21/01/1948. | ||
24/01/1948 | Modification | Diagram 15D number 3682 boiler fitted | ||
24/01/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to E3843 | ||
15/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1949. Dep: 05/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D) Renumbered to BR 63843 |
||
20/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cudworth (53E) | ||
01/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (36B) | ||
16/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1952. Dep: 10/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22302 (Diagram 15D) |
||
02/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1956. Dep: 23/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22300 (Diagram 15D) |
||
14/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/12/1960. Dep: 21/01/1961. | ||
01/03/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63843 from Langwith Junction (41J) |