|
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/04/1928 | 30/06/1928 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6613 |
||
Darlington Works | 22/04/1930 | 31/07/1930 | 101 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/01/1933 | 11/02/1933 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 21/07/1934 | 11/08/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1939 | 20/05/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/09/1941 | 27/09/1941 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 749 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2001 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22059 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
21/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1928. Dep: 30/06/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6613 |
||
30/06/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
30/06/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
27/09/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
22/04/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1930. Dep: 31/07/1930. | ||
17/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1158 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1933. Dep: 11/02/1933. | ||
21/07/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 11/08/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1315 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
03/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3268 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
24/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
13/09/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1941. Dep: 27/09/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3267 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to WD 749 |
||
19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 749 from Heaton (HTN) |