|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/03/1924 | 07/06/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6331 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/03/1927 | 30/04/1927 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1929 | 13/07/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1931 | 02/05/1931 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1933 | 29/07/1933 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/07/1935 | 10/08/1935 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
Gorton Works | 14/08/1937 | 28/08/1937 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1939 | 16/12/1939 | 15 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/11/1942 | 28/12/1942 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1945 | 26/05/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/09/1947 | 18/10/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1949 | 13/08/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63721 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/12/1951 | 19/01/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1952 | 24/01/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 20/02/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 50 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/04/1958 | 24/05/1958 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1959 | 21/02/1959 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1645 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 3753 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2858 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
29/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1924. Dep: 07/06/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6331 |
||
05/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/06/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
19/03/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1927. Dep: 30/04/1927. | ||
18/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 13/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1873 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1931. Dep: 02/05/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1886 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 117 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1935. Dep: 10/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1120 (Diagram 15) Intensifore lubricator removed |
||
14/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1937. Dep: 28/08/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 934 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 16/12/1939. | ||
16/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/11/1942. Dep: 28/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1133 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1945. Dep: 26/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3242 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3721 | ||
24/11/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
01/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
20/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1947. Dep: 18/10/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1858 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
29/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/09/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
30/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3219 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63721 |
||
04/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
10/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
22/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
28/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (39A) | ||
29/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1951. Dep: 19/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22235 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/01/1952. Dep: 24/01/1952. | ||
20/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/8 Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28340 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/04/1958. Dep: 24/05/1958. | ||
31/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1959. Dep: 21/02/1959. | ||
05/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28448 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63721 from Gorton (9G) |