Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 48 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 4767 Week
» 15912 Month
» 115697 Year
» 1781073 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 1800 m/e 04/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6298   05/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3883   29/07/1946
British Railways 63883 w/e 26/03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L707
Works Number 22093
To Service During 04/1919
Taken into Stock 05/04/1924
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962 off Mexborough (41F)
Service Life 43 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys
Information Atlas Works

Disposal
Scrapping Round Oak Steelworks (Brierly Hill)

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Round Oak Steel, Brierley Hill, 3/64

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1919
GOR   Gorton on 10/04/1924
LNG   Langwith Junction on 21/04/1924
DON   Doncaster on 08/12/1946
36D   Barnsley on 26/02/1950
36D   Barnsley w/e 04/03/1950
41F   Mexborough on 03/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DON Doncaster on 08/12/1946
ALLOC 36D Barnsley w/e 04/03/1950
ALLOC 41F Mexborough 4w/e 23/01/1960
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1956)
13/10/1928 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1945)
06/09/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1289)
28/05/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1326)
27/10/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1028)
03/10/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1042)
03/11/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
04/02/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 515)
28/06/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3254)
31/07/1943 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3360)
09/12/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3266)
16/11/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3389)
26/03/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
01/03/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22247)
05/03/1955 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22258)
23/08/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22107)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 05/04/1924 57 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6298
 
Gorton Works 24/04/1926 17/07/1926 85 days General    
Gorton Works 14/07/1928 13/10/1928 92 days General Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1930 06/09/1930 29 days General Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1932 28/05/1932 15 days General Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 27/10/1934 15 days General Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1936 03/11/1936 9 days General Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1939 04/02/1939 15 days General Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/06/1941 28/06/1941 19 days General Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/07/1943 31/07/1943 13 days General Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 17/06/1944 24/06/1944 8 days Light Repair    
Gorton Works 25/11/1944 09/12/1944 15 days Heavy Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1946 16/11/1946 15 days General Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1949 26/03/1949 15 days General Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63883
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1952 01/03/1952 22 days General Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1955 05/03/1955 29 days General Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1958 23/08/1958 50 days General Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 02/09/1958 13/09/1958 12 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 1800
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22093
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6298
   
05/04/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
10/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
21/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
24/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926.    
14/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15)
   
09/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 06/09/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15)
   
14/05/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15)
   
13/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15)
   
03/10/1936 Modification Diagram 15 number 1042 boiler fitted    
26/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1936. Dep: 03/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
   
21/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15)
   
10/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15)
   
19/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15)
   
17/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.    
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15)
   
29/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3883    
02/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15)
   
08/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63883
   
26/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
04/03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Barnsley (36D)    
09/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15)
   
05/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15)
   
05/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958.    
03/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63883 from Mexborough (41F)    

prev prev