|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 05/04/1924 | 57 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6298 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/04/1926 | 17/07/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/07/1928 | 13/10/1928 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1930 | 06/09/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1932 | 28/05/1932 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1934 | 27/10/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/10/1936 | 03/11/1936 | 9 days | General | Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/01/1939 | 04/02/1939 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/06/1941 | 28/06/1941 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/07/1943 | 31/07/1943 | 13 days | General | Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/06/1944 | 24/06/1944 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1944 | 09/12/1944 | 15 days | Heavy | Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/11/1946 | 16/11/1946 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/03/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63883 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1952 | 01/03/1952 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1955 | 05/03/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/07/1958 | 23/08/1958 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1958 | 13/09/1958 | 12 days | Unclassified |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 1800 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22093 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 05/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6298 |
||
05/04/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
10/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
21/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
24/04/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1926. Dep: 17/07/1926. | ||
14/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1945 (Diagram 15) |
||
09/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 06/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1289 (Diagram 15) |
||
14/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1326 (Diagram 15) |
||
13/10/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1028 (Diagram 15) |
||
03/10/1936 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1042 boiler fitted | ||
26/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1936. Dep: 03/11/1936. Work undertaken: Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes) |
||
21/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 515 (Diagram 15) |
||
10/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/06/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3254 (Diagram 15) |
||
19/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3360 (Diagram 15) |
||
17/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944. | ||
25/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3266 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/07/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3883 | ||
02/11/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1946. Dep: 16/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3389 (Diagram 15) |
||
08/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
12/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63883 |
||
26/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
04/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Barnsley (36D) | ||
09/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22247 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 05/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22258 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1958. Dep: 23/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22107 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/09/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958. | ||
03/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63883 from Mexborough (41F) |