Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 32 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 2958 Week
» 4696 Month
» 132139 Year
» 1797515 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2043 m/e 05/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6614   24/03/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3845   17/11/1946
British Railways 63845 w/e 06/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22137
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 20/03/1928
Withdrawal Thu 22/06/1961 off Staveley (G.C.) (41H)
Service Life 42 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1919
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 20/03/1928
HLS   Hull Springhead on 23/10/1929
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 11/07/1933
CUD   Cudworth on 04/12/1935
HTN   Heaton on 28/03/1943
TDK   Tyne Dock on 23/07/1945
HTN   Heaton on 22/07/1946
TDK   Tyne Dock on 08/09/1946
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 06/02/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
53E   Cudworth on 12/11/1950
53E   Cudworth m/e 30/11/1950
20C   Royston on 12/08/1951
38A   Colwick on 02/09/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 08/09/1951
38B   Annesley on 22/01/1956
38D   Staveley (G.C.) on 11/11/1956
     Withdrawn on 22/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 53E Cudworth m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 20C Royston w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 20C Royston on 12/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley 4w/e 28/01/1956
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 22/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1304)
01/07/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1378)
02/11/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1864)
04/06/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3238)
16/11/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3312)
01/08/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1090)
08/01/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3217)
11/01/1947 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 807)
06/08/1949 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3306)
05/04/1952 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22257)
02/10/1954 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22263)
10/05/1958 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22288)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 14/01/1928 24/03/1928 71 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6614
 
Darlington Works 18/08/1930 13/10/1930 57 days General    
Gorton Works 17/06/1933 01/07/1933 15 days General Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1935 02/11/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1936 19/12/1936 8 days Light Repair Anti-vacuum valve leaking
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1938 04/06/1938 15 days General Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1940 16/11/1940 8 days General Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/07/1942 01/08/1942 9 days Heavy Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1943 08/01/1944 19 days General Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1946 11/01/1947 22 days General Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1949 06/08/1949 15 days General Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63845
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1952 05/04/1952 22 days General Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1954 02/10/1954 43 days General Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1954 13/11/1954 40 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 12/04/1958 10/05/1958 29 days General Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1958 18/05/1958 6 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 29/05/1961 29/05/1961 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2043
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22137
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
14/01/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/01/1928. Dep: 24/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6614
   
20/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
20/03/1928 To Stock To ROD stock    
23/10/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
18/08/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1930. Dep: 13/10/1930.    
17/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 01/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1378 (Diagram 15)
   
11/07/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
19/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1935. Dep: 02/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1864 (Diagram 15)
   
04/12/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (CUD)    
12/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/12/1936. Dep: 19/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Anti-vacuum valve leaking
   
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3238 (Diagram 15)
   
09/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1940. Dep: 16/11/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15)
   
24/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 24/07/1942. Dep: 01/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1090 (Diagram 15)
   
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
21/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1943. Dep: 08/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3217 (Diagram 15)
   
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
22/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3845    
21/12/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1946. Dep: 11/01/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 807 (Diagram 15)
   
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
23/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1949. Dep: 06/08/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3306 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63845
   
12/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (53E)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (53E)    
12/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
15/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1952. Dep: 05/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22257 (Diagram 15)
   
21/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1954. Dep: 02/10/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22263 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 13/11/1954.    
22/01/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
11/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
12/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1958. Dep: 10/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22288 (Diagram 15)
   
13/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 18/05/1958.    
29/05/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 29/05/1961. Dep: 29/05/1961.    
22/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 63845 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H)    

prev prev