|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 22/02/1924 | 22/08/1924 | 183 days | General | Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6290 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/12/1926 | 18/03/1927 | 80 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/03/1929 | 30/04/1929 | 49 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1931 | 28/10/1931 | 111 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/01/1932 | 02/02/1932 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/05/1932 | 11/08/1932 | 86 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/12/1933 | 08/01/1934 | 32 days | General | Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/12/1935 | 29/01/1936 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/04/1938 | 01/06/1938 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1940 | 19/10/1940 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/03/1943 | 01/05/1943 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1945 | 24/03/1945 | 37 days | General | After collision Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/03/1947 | 12/05/1947 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1949 | 24/09/1949 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63847 |
||
Gorton Works | 31/10/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 47 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 06/04/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1954 | 01/01/1955 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1955 | 11/01/1955 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1959 | 23/04/1959 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2046 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22139 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2837 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
22/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1924. Dep: 22/08/1924. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O4/2 Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6290 |
||
22/08/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
22/08/1924 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
29/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1926. Dep: 18/03/1927. | ||
13/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/03/1929. Dep: 30/04/1929. | ||
10/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1931. Dep: 28/10/1931. | ||
22/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1932. Dep: 02/02/1932. | ||
18/05/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1932. Dep: 11/08/1932. | ||
08/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1933. Dep: 08/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1474 (Diagram 15) |
||
06/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1935. Dep: 29/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1041 (Diagram 15) |
||
12/04/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1938. Dep: 01/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3237 (Diagram 15) |
||
25/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1940. Dep: 19/10/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1029 (Diagram 15) |
||
29/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1943. Dep: 01/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3368 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/07/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
16/02/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1945. Dep: 24/03/1945. Work undertaken: After collision Boiler number 3249 (Diagram 15) |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3847 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 12/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
24/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
29/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1949. Dep: 24/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) Renumbered to BR 63847 |
||
31/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
18/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
06/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22265 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1954. Dep: 01/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 22147 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/01/1955. Dep: 11/01/1955. | ||
23/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/04/1959. Dep: 23/04/1959. | ||
04/05/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63847 from Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |