Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 32 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1869 Week
» 13014 Month
» 112799 Year
» 1778175 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2047 m/e 05/1919
London and North Western Railway 2838 m/e 09/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6291   14/08/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3848   29/12/1946
British Railways 63848 w/e 01/01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/205/1919
O4/7 (2-8-0)24/07/1943
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22140
To Service During 05/1919
Taken into Stock 14/08/1924
Withdrawal w/e Sat 03/11/1962 off Gorton (9G)
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 11/62

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1919
91LNWR   (on loan)   09/1919
ROD       08/1921
DFU   Dunfermline Upper on 14/08/1924
DEE   Dundee Tay Bridge on 12/03/1931
ABD   Aberdeen Ferryhill on 03/08/1937
IMM   Immingham on 24/07/1943
TUX   Tuxford on 09/01/1944
IMM   Immingham on 15/10/1944
GOR   Gorton on 12/05/1946
CLK   Colwick on 16/06/1946
ANN   Annesley on 23/05/1948
ANN   Annesley w/e 29/05/1948
39A   Gorton on 23/04/1950
     Withdrawn w/e 03/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC 39A Gorton w/e 23/04/1950
LOAN 9H Gorton on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 9H Gorton on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 03/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1470)
05/11/1931 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1038)
31/05/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1937)
09/07/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1281)
30/10/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number C1472)
18/11/1939 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
21/06/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1129)
24/07/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3694)
10/11/1945 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3695)
14/11/1947 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3676)
31/12/1948 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3663)
08/04/1950 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3672)
21/06/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22336)
20/04/1957 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22328)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Darlington Works 21/02/1924 14/08/1924 176 days General Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6291
 
Cowlairs Works 08/10/1926 23/02/1927 139 days General    
Cowlairs Works 04/04/1928 14/04/1928 11 days Light Repair    
Cowlairs Works 11/05/1928 17/05/1928 7 days General    
Cowlairs Works 28/06/1929 12/08/1929 46 days General    
Cowlairs Works 11/08/1931 05/11/1931 87 days General Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1933 31/05/1933 70 days General No snifting valve
Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1935 09/07/1935 82 days General Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1937 30/10/1937 37 days General Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 05/10/1939 18/11/1939 45 days General Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1941 21/06/1941 30 days General Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/09/1941 13/09/1941 6 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 09/06/1943 24/07/1943 46 days General Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1945 10/11/1945 56 days General Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1947 14/11/1947 35 days General Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1948 31/12/1948 30 days Heavy Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63848
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1950 08/04/1950 35 days General Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1952 21/06/1952 37 days General Boiler number 22336 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 24/09/1954 30/10/1954 37 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 12/03/1957 20/04/1957 40 days General Boiler number 22328 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1959 05/11/1959 39 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 27/07/1960 19/08/1960 24 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 21/11/1961 25/11/1961 5 days Unclassified    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2047
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22140
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
09/1919 Allocation      
09/1919 Renumbered Renumbered to 2838    
08/1921 Allocation      
21/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/02/1924. Dep: 14/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/2
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6291
   
14/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Dunfermline Upper (DFU)    
14/08/1924 To Stock To LNER stock    
08/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1926. Dep: 23/02/1927.    
04/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/04/1928. Dep: 14/04/1928.    
11/05/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1928. Dep: 17/05/1928.    
28/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1929. Dep: 12/08/1929.    
12/03/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE)    
11/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1931. Dep: 05/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1038 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1933. Dep: 31/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
No snifting valve
Boiler number 1937 (Diagram 15)
   
19/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1935. Dep: 09/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1281 (Diagram 15)
   
03/08/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD)    
24/09/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/09/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number C1472 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1939. Dep: 18/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
   
23/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1941. Dep: 21/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1129 (Diagram 15)
   
08/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.    
09/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3694 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/01/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Tuxford (TUX)    
15/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/09/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22321 (Diagram 15D)
   
12/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/06/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3848    
11/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3676 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
02/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 02/12/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3663 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63848
   
05/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1950. Dep: 08/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3672 (Diagram 15D)
   
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
16/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1952. Dep: 21/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22336 (Diagram 15D)
   
24/09/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1954. Dep: 30/10/1954.    
12/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22328 (Diagram 15D)
   
28/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/09/1959. Dep: 05/11/1959.    
27/07/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1960. Dep: 19/08/1960.    
21/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/11/1961. Dep: 25/11/1961.    
03/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63848 from Gorton (9G)    

prev prev