Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 917 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1825 Week
» 12970 Month
» 112755 Year
» 1778131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2059 m/e 06/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6616   29/10/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3855   30/12/1946
British Railways 63855 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22150
To Service During 06/1919
Taken into Stock 29/10/1927
Withdrawal Tue 31/03/1959 off Doncaster (36A)
Service Life 39 yrs , 10 mths
Information Queen's Park Works

Disposal
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Notes
Notes Cut up at Gorton

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1919
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 29/10/1927
HLS   Hull Springhead on 24/03/1930
WHL   West Hartlepool on 10/05/1940
NPT   Newport (Teeside) on 05/10/1944
WHL   West Hartlepool on 18/10/1944
HLS   Hull Springhead on 10/01/1945
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 29/09/1946
36A   Doncaster on 02/09/1951
36A   Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
     Withdrawn on 31/03/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 36A Doncaster on 02/09/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   on 31/03/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1234)
29/04/1933 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1027)
22/06/1935 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1033)
03/07/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1106)
20/04/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1082)
28/02/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 862)
18/03/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3291)
22/06/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 853)
04/09/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3351)
02/06/1951 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22190)
27/04/1957 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22163)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Duration Level of Work Actual Mileage
Gorton Works 30/07/1927 29/10/1927 92 days General Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6616
 
Darlington Works 12/06/1930 15/09/1930 96 days General    
Gorton Works 22/04/1933 29/04/1933 8 days General Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/06/1935 22/06/1935 15 days General Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1937 03/07/1937 22 days General Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1940 20/04/1940 8 days General Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 09/02/1942 28/02/1942 20 days General Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 28/02/1944 18/03/1944 20 days General Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 01/06/1946 22/06/1946 22 days General Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1948 04/09/1948 22 days General Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63855
 
Gorton Works 12/05/1951 02/06/1951 22 days General Boiler number 22190 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 14/03/1953 21/03/1953 8 days Light Casual Tender changed
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1953 26/03/1953 3 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 17/10/1953 31/10/1953 15 days Heavy Intermediate    
Gorton Works 03/11/1953 10/11/1953 8 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 27/10/1956 10/11/1956 15 days Light Casual    
Gorton Works 13/11/1956 14/11/1956 2 days Unclassified    
Gorton Works 06/04/1957 27/04/1957 22 days Heavy Casual Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/03/1959 23/03/1959 1 day No repairs    

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2059
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22150
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6616
   
29/10/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
29/10/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
24/03/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
12/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1930. Dep: 15/09/1930.    
22/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1027 (Diagram 15)
   
08/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1935. Dep: 22/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1033 (Diagram 15)
   
12/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1106 (Diagram 15)
   
13/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1082 (Diagram 15)
   
10/05/1940 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
09/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1942. Dep: 28/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 862 (Diagram 15)
   
28/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1944. Dep: 18/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3291 (Diagram 15)
   
05/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (NPT)    
18/10/1944 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (WHL)    
10/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
01/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 22/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 853 (Diagram 15)
   
29/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
30/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3855    
14/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3351 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63855
   
12/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/05/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22190 (Diagram 15)
   
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
14/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/03/1953. Dep: 21/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender changed
   
24/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 26/03/1953.    
17/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/10/1953. Dep: 31/10/1953.    
03/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 10/11/1953.    
27/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/10/1956. Dep: 10/11/1956.    
13/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/11/1956. Dep: 14/11/1956.    
06/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/04/1957. Dep: 27/04/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22163 (Diagram 15)
   
23/03/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 23/03/1959.    
31/03/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 63855 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev