|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 03/03/1928 | 05/05/1928 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6617 |
||
Darlington Works | 27/10/1930 | 05/12/1930 | 40 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/07/1932 | 06/08/1932 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1934 | 22/09/1934 | 8 days | General | Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1936 | 17/10/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1940 | 01/06/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1942 | 24/10/1942 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/09/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/03/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1948 | 14/02/1948 | 8 days | Heavy | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3856 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/06/1949 | 22/10/1949 | 120 days | General | Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5120 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63856 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1951 | 08/09/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/04/1952 | 17/05/1952 | 30 days | Light Casual | Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic Vacuum Ejector fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1953 | 30/01/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1954 | 22/01/1955 | 58 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 19/04/1956 | 26/05/1956 | 38 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1959 | 01/02/1960 | 68 days | General | Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/11/1960 | 17/12/1960 | 32 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1961 | 21/10/1961 | 40 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1954 | York Area | October Two further representatives of Class B17 visited York in October, after visits to Doncaster Works, namely 61670 (32D) on 6/10/54 and 61659 (32A) on 28/10/54. Further unusual visitors on 6/10/54 were 45038 (5B) and Stanier 2-6-0 42956 (5B). On 11/10/54 69770 (53A) passed through York for Darlington Works. On 16/10/54 61223 (31A) 'worked an Up freight train, and 68429 (J77) passed through light after a period in store at Selby en route for several weeks' loan to Sunderland. On 19/10/54 73053 (20A) failed at York when working the 8.46 a.m. from Bradford (Forster Square) to Scarborough and was replaced by 61016 (50A). A few days later 73066 (20A) commenced appearances on this turn; this engine has tender 1005/54 of B.R. Series 1C. 69771 (53A) passed through York on 2/11/54 en route for scrapping at Darlington; the rate of withdrawal of this class is being accelerated and 69780 (53C) has also been withdrawn from service in November. 67772 (34E), ex-Darlington Works, passed through York on 2/11/54 returning to Neasden, and on 17/11/54 67740 (34E) appeared in similar circumstances. 63856 (54B) was in York shed yard with motion disconnected, etc., on 30/11/54, en route for Gorton Works; this is one of the locomotives fitted with the additional pumps on the right hand side of the boiler in connection with the Tyne Dock-Consett iron ore trains. 73053 (20A) became divided between the engine and tender at about 10 a.m. on 19/11/54 while running at speed with the 9.22 a.m. Leeds City to Scarborough, necessitating the train being drawn back to Church Fenton where it was re-engined and went forward at 11.5 a.m. 73053 was later removed to York shed for repair where it remained for some days. |
SLS/195412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1919 | To Service | To service as ROD Number 2062 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22153 Diagram 15 boiler fitted |
||
09/1919 | Allocation | |||
09/1919 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 2835 | ||
08/1921 | Allocation | |||
03/03/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1928. Dep: 05/05/1928. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6617 |
||
05/05/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
05/05/1928 | To Stock | To LNER stock | ||
06/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
27/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1930. Dep: 05/12/1930. | ||
30/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1932. Dep: 06/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15) |
||
15/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 22/09/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 15) |
||
01/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS) | ||
03/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1936. Dep: 17/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1231 (Diagram 15) |
||
05/03/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3223 (Diagram 15) |
||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 01/06/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3216 (Diagram 15) |
||
02/10/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3226 (Diagram 15) |
||
28/03/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
25/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1206 (Diagram 15) |
||
23/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
02/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3241 (Diagram 15) |
||
22/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (HTN) | ||
08/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3856 | ||
07/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 14/02/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3856 |
||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
25/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1949. Dep: 22/10/1949. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class O1 Boiler number 5120 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 63856 |
||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C) | ||
21/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
10/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 08/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28343 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
18/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/04/1952. Dep: 17/05/1952. Work undertaken: Westinghouse pumps and vacuum ejector fitted for working iron ore traffic Vacuum Ejector fitted |
||
23/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1953. Dep: 30/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28335 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1954. Dep: 22/01/1955. | ||
19/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 26/05/1956. | ||
11/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28856 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1959. Dep: 01/02/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28321 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/11/1960. Dep: 17/12/1960. | ||
12/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1961. Dep: 21/10/1961. | ||
26/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63856 from Tyne Dock (52H) |