Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 144 Today
» 1120 Yesterday
» 3533 Week
» 22434 Month
» 22434 Year
» 1687810 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2063 m/e 07/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6618   10/03/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3857   04/08/1946
British Railways 63857 w/e 18/06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1919
O4/7 (2-8-0)15/05/1943
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22154
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 10/03/1928
Withdrawal Wed 08/08/1962 off Ardsley (56B)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/62

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1919
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 10/03/1928
HLS Hull Springhead on 18/11/1929
DAR Darlington on 06/01/1940
HTN Heaton on 24/02/1940
TDK Tyne Dock on 23/07/1945
HTN Heaton on 22/07/1946
TDK Tyne Dock on 08/09/1946
HLD Hull Dairycoates on 06/02/1949
53E Cudworth on 12/11/1950
20C Royston on 12/08/1951
38A Colwick on 02/09/1951
37A Ardsley on 22/09/1952
56A Wakefield on 22/02/1959
56B Ardsley on 11/06/1961
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 53E Cudworth m/e 30/11/1950
LOAN 20C Royston w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 20C Royston on 12/08/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 08/07/1961
WDN   on 08/08/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 858)
05/12/1930 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1016)
23/07/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1286)
03/11/1934 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1176)
27/06/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 548)
29/10/1938 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1075)
14/06/1941 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 929)
15/05/1943 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3692)
12/01/1946 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3662)
18/06/1949 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 3670)
15/03/1952 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22329)
06/11/1954 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22332)
02/08/1958 Diagram 15D boiler fitted (number 22310)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/11/1927 10/03/1928 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6618
 
Darlington Works 20/10/1930 05/12/1930 47 days General
Boiler number 1016 (Diagram 15)
 
Darlington Works 24/05/1932 24/05/1932 1 day No repairs
Sent to Gorton
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1932 23/07/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 1286 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 20/10/1934 03/11/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1176 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 27/06/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 548 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1938 29/10/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 1075 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1941 14/06/1941 15 days General
Boiler number 929 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 22/04/1943 15/05/1943 24 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/7
Boiler number 3692 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 22/12/1945 12/01/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3662 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 26/04/1947 17/05/1947 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 21/05/1949 18/06/1949 29 days General
After collision
Boiler number 3670 (Diagram 15D)
Renumbered to BR 63857
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1952 15/03/1952 22 days General
Boiler number 22329 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1954 06/11/1954 36 days General
Boiler number 22332 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1958 02/08/1958 64 days General
Boiler number 22310 (Diagram 15D)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1960 19/11/1960 50 days Light Casual  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2063
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22154
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
10/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
10/03/1928 To Stock To LNER stock    
18/11/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (HLS)    
06/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (DAR)    
24/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
23/07/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
22/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (HTN)    
04/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 3857    
08/09/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
12/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cudworth (53E)    
12/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (20C)    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
22/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
11/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
08/08/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 63857 from Ardsley (56B)    

prev prev