Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 897 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6393 Week
» 25294 Month
» 25294 Year
» 1690670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 2064 m/e 07/1919
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6619   30/06/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3858   07/09/1946
British Railways (BR Tmp) E3858   05/02/1948
British Railways 63858 w/e 27/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class O4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
O4/307/1919
O4/8 (2-8-0)09/05/1953
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L712
Works Number 22155
To Service During 07/1919
Taken into Stock 30/06/1927
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966 off Doncaster (36A)
Scrapping W George, Station Steel (Wath)
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 18 dys
Information Hyde Park Works

Notes
Notes Sold for scrap to Station Steel, Wath, 5/66

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1919
NWE New England on 30/06/1927
CLK Colwick on 14/11/1933
LNG Langwith Junction on 01/12/1940
CLK Colwick on 27/10/1946
ANN Annesley on 06/02/1949
39A Gorton on 26/11/1950
36A Doncaster on 14/10/1951
40E Colwick on 29/08/1965
36A Doncaster on 26/12/1965
   Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 02/11/1946
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC 39A Gorton m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 04/09/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1919 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1107)
20/08/1932 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1189)
01/02/1936 Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
01/02/1936 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1169)
01/02/1936 Intensifore lubricator removed
21/08/1937 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1058)
24/02/1940 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1254)
28/09/1942 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1235)
16/09/1944 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3271)
07/09/1946 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1005)
27/11/1948 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 3271)
25/11/1950 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 22134)
09/05/1953 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28842)
19/01/1957 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28511)
07/09/1962 Diagram 100A boiler fitted (number 28341)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/06/1927 30/06/1927 27 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6619
 
Gorton Works 25/09/1929 25/11/1929 62 days General  
Gorton Works 11/07/1932 20/08/1932 41 days General
Boiler number 1189 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1936 01/02/1936 20 days General
Boiler number 1169 (Diagram 15)
Fountain lubrication fitted (axleboxes)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1937 21/08/1937 17 days General
Boiler number 1058 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1940 24/02/1940 35 days General
Boiler number 1254 (Diagram 15)
 
Stratford Works 05/08/1942 28/09/1942 55 days General
Boiler number 1235 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 23/08/1944 16/09/1944 25 days General
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1946 07/09/1946 49 days General
Boiler number 1005 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3858
 
Gorton Works 18/12/1947 05/02/1948 50 days General
Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E3858
 
Gorton Works 18/10/1948 27/11/1948 41 days General
Boiler number 3271 (Diagram 15)
Renumbered to BR 63858
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1950 25/11/1950 31 days General
Boiler number 22134 (Diagram 15)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1953 09/05/1953 61 days General
Rebuilt to class O4/8
Boiler number 28842 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1954 18/12/1954 24 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 17/12/1956 19/01/1957 34 days General
Boiler number 28511 (Diagram 100A)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1959 19/06/1959 18 days Light Casual  
Gorton Works 31/07/1962 07/09/1962 39 days General
Boiler number 28341 (Diagram 100A)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/01/1962 Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) New Erecting Shop: D3453, E3088-94. Outside Erecting Shop: 60817, 61375, 61861/99, 63858, 68900, 70003/7. Erecting Shop: D2406, D3289, 13336, D3487, D5522/47/95, D5822. D8021, 08213, D9012, 12133, 43032, 60025/47/61/87, 60134, 60854, 61051, 61223/52, 61374, 62013, 63924/38, 70006, 76046. Stripping Road-dept. 10/1: 60938, 62034, 63571. Outside Crimpsal: D3482. 70018. Crimpsal: 60014/43/63/83/97. Outside Weighshop: 60138/57. Paint Shop: D374 (BE 3120 VF D670 of 1961), D5369 (BRCW DEL 212 of 1961), D5644, D5828 (Brush 364 of 1961), D5830 (Brush 366 of 1961), E3086/7, 60027/84 an 60125. SLS/196202
26/02/1962 Doncaster Works (Works Shunters) Works Yard: 43158, 60039/67, 60153, 60517, 60905/28, 61000/58, 61234, 62014, 63942. Stripping Shop: 60108, 60500, 63932. Outside Stripping Shop: 60040, 60162, 60850/75, 62034, 63652, 70036, 73016. Erecting Shop: D3129, D3440/80/2, D5655/63, D6707/9/15, D8210, 43080, 60030/2/51, 60129/39, 60871, 61281, 63630, 63872, 63945/84, 70038, 73036. Outside Erecting Shop: D5525, D5605/43/70, 60028. Weigh House: 60026, 60119. Scrap Road: 61818, 61945/66, 64177/91, 64245. Paint Shop: D380, D2408, D5376, E3071/2, 12126, 60078, 60870, 61315, 63571. New Erecting Shop: D6700, D8027, E3073-8. Boiler Shop: E3079/80. Works Shunters: DEPT.10/1, 63858, 68928. Ex-Works: 61285. SLS/196204
05/09/1965 Locomotives Stored at Barry (Behind Barry Works) In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. SLS/196510
06/02/1966 Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry 5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. SLS/196603

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1919 To Service To service as ROD Number 2064
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22155
Diagram 15 boiler fitted
   
30/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
30/06/1927 To Stock To LNER stock    
14/11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG)    
27/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
06/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
26/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (39A)    
14/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
29/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
26/12/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 63858 from Doncaster (36A)    

prev prev